Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Robert Klauss (until 2022-10-03) | 1984-12-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patric Klandt (until 2022-06-30) | 1983-09-29 | |||
26 | Christian Mathenia | 1992-03-31 | |||
31 | Jan Reichert (from 2022-01-26) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-06-28 | |||
31 | Carl Klaus (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-01-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jannik Hofmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-28 | ||||
Benas Satkus (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-04-01 | ||||
4 | Asger Sorensen (until 2022-07-20) | 1996-06-05 | |||
13 | Pius Kratschmer (until 2021-08-04) | 1997-06-16 | |||
16 | Christopher Schindler (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-04-29 | |||
18 | Mario Suver (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-09-23 | |||
19 | Florian Hubner (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-03-01 | |||
22 | Enrico Valentini | 1989-02-20 | |||
29 | Tim-Henry Handwerker (until 2024-01-24) | 1998-05-19 | |||
34 | Konstantin Rausch (from 2021-08-14) (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-03-15 | |||
35 | Noel Knothe (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Kilian Fischer (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-10-12 | |||
5 | Johannes Geis (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-08-17 | |||
6 | Lino Tempelmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-02 | |||
8 | Taylan Duman | 1997-07-30 | |||
10 | Nikola Dovedan (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-07-06 | |||
11 | Erik Shuranov (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-22 | |||
14 | Tom Krauss (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-22 | |||
14 | Linus Rosenlocher (until 2022-01-11) | 2000-09-09 | |||
15 | Fabian Nurnberger (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-28 | |||
17 | Jens Castrop (from 2022-01-07) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-29 | |||
17 | Robin Hack (until 2021-08-08) | 1998-08-27 | |||
21 | Tim Latteier (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-05-20 | |||
24 | Mats Moller Daehli (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | |||
34 | Bryang Kayo (from 2022-01-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-27 | |||
36 | Lukas Schleimer | 1999-12-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Felix Lohkemper (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-26 | |||
9 | Manuel Schaffler (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
18 | Dennis Borkowski (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-26 | |||
20 | Pascal Kopke (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-03 | |||
27 | Paul-Philipp Besong (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-10-06 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Adam Gnezda Cerin (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-07-16 | ||||
Linus Rosenlocher (from 2022-01-11) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-09-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-07 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2021-10-26 20:45 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |