Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Markus Anfang (from 2022-06-10) (until 2024-04-20) | 1974-06-12 | ||||
Alexander Schmidt (until 2022-06-30) | 1968-10-23 | ||||
Guerino Capretti (from 2022-03-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1982-02-05 | ||||
Athletiktrainer | |||||
Matthias Grahe (until 2024-06-30) | 1968-11-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kevin Broll (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-08-23 | |||
22 | Anton Mitrjuschkin (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-08 | |||
24 | Patrick Wiegers (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-04-19 | |||
31 | Marius Liesegang (from 2022-01-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | guram-giorbelidze Guram Giorbelidse (from 2021-08-11) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-25 | |||
3 | Michael Akoto (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-10-03 | |||
4 | Tim Knipping (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-11-24 | |||
15 | Chris Lowe (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-04-16 | |||
16 | Robin Becker (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-01-18 | |||
21 | Michael Sollbauer (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-05-15 | |||
23 | Antonis Aidonis (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-05-22 | |||
26 | Sebastian Mai (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-12-10 | |||
36 | Max Kulke (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-11-10 | |||
39 | Kevin Ehlers (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jonas Kühn (until 2021-08-11) | 2002-03-20 | ||||
5 | Yannick Stark (until 2022-08-24) | 1990-10-28 | |||
7 | Panagiotis Vlachodimos (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-12 | |||
14 | Adrian Fein (from 2022-01-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-18 | |||
17 | Morris Schroter (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-08-20 | |||
19 | Luca Herrmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | |||
20 | Jongmin Seo (until 2022-02-06) | 2002-05-09 | |||
28 | Paul Will (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-01 | |||
30 | Julius Kade (from 2021-07-21) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-20 | |||
34 | Leon Lowe (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-12-30 | |||
36 | Max Kulke (until 2022-01-11) | 2000-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Simon Gollnack (until 2021-08-30) | 2002-01-29 | ||||
Vasil Kusej (until 2021-07-10) | 2000-05-24 | ||||
8 | Heinz Morschel (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-08-24 | |||
9 | Pascal Sohm (until 2022-01-12) | 1991-11-02 | |||
10 | Patrick Weihrauch (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-03 | |||
11 | Agyemang Diawusie (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | |||
14 | Philipp Hosiner (until 2022-01-11) | 1989-05-15 | |||
17 | Oliver Batista Meier (from 2022-01-03) (until 2024-02-02) | 2001-02-16 | |||
25 | Brandon Borrello (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-07-25 | |||
27 | Vaclav Drchal (from 2022-01-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-07-25 | |||
33 | Christoph Daferner (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-01-12 | |||
35 | Ransford Konigsdorffer (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-09-13 | |||
37 | Luka Stor (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-07-05 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Phil Harres (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-15 | ||||
Jonas Kühn (from 2021-08-12) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-20 | ||||
Max Kulke (from 2022-01-11) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-11-10 | ||||
Jongmin Seo (from 2022-02-07) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2021-08-06 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-10-27 18:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |