Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Timo Schultz (until 2022-12-06) | 1977-08-26 | ||||
Loic Fave (from 2021-07-03) (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-02-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dennis Smarsch (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-14 | |||
22 | Nikola Vasilj | 1995-12-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Justin Plautz (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-04-09 | ||||
2 | Sebastian Ohlsson (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-05-26 | |||
3 | James Lawrence (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-08-22 | |||
4 | Philipp Ziereis (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-03-14 | |||
6 | Christopher Avevor (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-02-11 | |||
15 | Marcel Beifus (from 2021-08-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-10-27 | |||
18 | Jakov Medic (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-09-07 | |||
19 | Luca Zander (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-08-09 | |||
20 | Yi-Young Park (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-06-29 | |||
21 | Lars Ritzka (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-07 | |||
23 | Leart Pacarada (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-10-08 | |||
25 | Adam Dźwigała (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-25 | |||
29 | Niklas Jessen (from 2022-02-24) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-04 | |||
32 | Jannes Wieckhoff (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-08-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Viet (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-27 | ||||
5 | Marvin Knoll (until 2022-01-06) | 1990-12-05 | |||
7 | Jackson Irvine (from 2021-07-05) (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-03-07 | |||
8 | Eric Smith | 1997-01-08 | |||
10 | Christopher Buchtmann (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-25 | |||
11 | Max Dittgen (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-03-03 | |||
13 | Lukas Daschner (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-10-01 | |||
14 | Afeez Aremu (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-03 | |||
20 | Finn Ole Becker (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-08 | |||
22 | Maximilian Franzke (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-05 | |||
26 | Rico Benatelli (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-03-17 | |||
29 | Christian Viet (until 2021-08-30) | 1999-03-27 | |||
30 | Marcel Hartel (from 2021-08-10) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-19 | |||
31 | Franz Roggow (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-14 | |||
31 | Ersin Zehir (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-01-15 | |||
34 | Igor Matanovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-31 | |||
36 | Luis Angel Coordes (until 2022-01-27) | 1999-01-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Guido Burgstaller (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-04-24 | |||
14 | Etienne Amenyido (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-01 | |||
16 | Simon Makienok (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-11-21 | |||
16 | Daniel Kyereh (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-03-08 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marvin Senger (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-06 | ||||
Christian Viet (from 2021-08-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-03-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-07 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-10-27 18:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-01-18 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-03-01 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |