Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Olaf Janssen (until 2023-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Markus Brzenska (from 2022-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1984-05-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sebastian Mielitz (until 2022-01-31) | 1989-07-18 | |||
22 | Moritz Nicolas (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-10-21 | |||
24 | Kevin Rauhut (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-12-30 | |||
25 | Elias-Jona Bördner (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-02-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Alexander Höck (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-30 | |||
3 | Maximilian Rossmann (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-05-06 | |||
5 | Daniel Buballa (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-05-11 | |||
15 | Christoph Greger | 1997-01-14 | |||
20 | Jamil Siebert (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-04-02 | |||
20 | Aaron Berzel (from 2021-07-30) (until 2022-01-13) | 1992-05-29 | |||
21 | Dario de Vita (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-02-12 | |||
28 | Patrick Koronkiewicz | 1991-03-13 | |||
34 | Benjamin Hemcke (until 2023-01-06) | 2003-02-14 | |||
39 | David Kubatta (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-10-29 | |||
40 | Oualid Mhamdi (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Jeremias Lorch (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-12-02 | |||
6 | Patrick Sontheimer (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-03 | |||
7 | Simon Handle | 1993-01-25 | |||
10 | David Lennart Philipp (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-10 | |||
17 | Florian Heister (until 2024-01-12) | 1997-03-02 | |||
18 | Kai Klefisch (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-12-03 | |||
23 | Moritz Fritz | 1993-07-15 | |||
26 | Joel Vieting (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-05-11 | |||
31 | Marcel Risse (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-12-17 | |||
36 | Ilhan Mustafa Altuntas (until 2023-01-19) | 2003-01-06 | |||
37 | Niklas May | 2002-04-10 | |||
38 | Seokju Hong (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-05-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Schirmer (from 2022-02-08) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-08 | ||||
9 | Michael Seaton (until 2021-07-05) | 1996-05-01 | |||
11 | Federico Palacios Martinez (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-04-09 | |||
12 | Albert Bunjaku (until 2022-01-31) | 1983-11-29 | |||
14 | Lenn Jastremski (from 2021-08-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-24 | |||
19 | Nikolaj Möller (until 2022-01-02) | 2002-07-20 | |||
30 | Luca Marseiler (from 2021-08-31) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-02-18 | |||
39 | Timmy Thiele (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-07-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2021-08-09 18:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |