Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tim Walter (until 2024-02-12) | 1975-11-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Heuer Fernandes (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-11-13 | |||
12 | Tom Mickel | 1989-04-19 | |||
16 | Marko Johansson (from 2021-08-11) (until 2022-08-31) | 1998-10-25 | |||
40 | Leo Oppermann (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-08-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Jan Gyamerah (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-06-18 | |||
3 | Moritz Heyer (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-04 | |||
4 | Sebastian Schonlau (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-08-05 | |||
14 | Nicolas Oliveira Kisilowski (from 2022-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-06 | |||
21 | Tim Leibold (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-11-30 | |||
27 | Josha Vagnoman (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-12-11 | |||
34 | Jonas David (until 2023-08-29) | 2000-03-08 | |||
35 | Stephan Kofi Ambrosius (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-12-18 | |||
35 | Stephan Kofi Ambrosius (until 2022-08-16) | 1998-12-18 | |||
41 | Maximilian Rohr (until 2022-08-30) | 1995-06-27 | |||
43 | Bent Andresen (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-07 | |||
44 | Mario Vuskovic (from 2021-08-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-11-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | David Kinsombi (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-12-12 | |||
7 | Giorgi Chakvetadze (from 2022-01-27) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-08-29 | |||
8 | Thomas Doyle (from 2021-09-01) (until 2022-01-19) | 2001-10-17 | |||
10 | Sonny Kittel (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-06 | |||
14 | Ludovit Reis (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-01 | |||
17 | Xavier Amaechi (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-05 | |||
20 | Klaus Gjasula (until 2021-08-10) | 1989-12-14 | |||
23 | Jonas Meffert (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-09-04 | |||
24 | Amadou Onana (until 2021-08-04) | 2001-08-16 | |||
36 | Anssi Suhonen (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-14 | |||
39 | Bryan Anthony Hein (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-25 | |||
43 | Moritz-Broni Kwarteng (until 2021-12-31) | 1998-04-24 | |||
46 | Elijah Krahn (from 2022-01-18) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Robert Glatzel | 1994-01-08 | |||
9 | Robert Glatzel (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-01-08 | |||
11 | Mikkel Kaufmann Sørensen (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-03 | |||
18 | Bakery Jatta (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-06 | |||
19 | Manuel Wintzheimer (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-10 | |||
22 | Robin Meissner (until 2022-01-30) | 1999-10-08 | |||
29 | Aaron Opoku (until 2021-08-24) | 1999-03-28 | |||
42 | Ogechika Heil (until 2023-08-31) | 2000-11-27 | |||
48 | Faride Alidou (from 2021-09-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-07-18 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Robin Meissner (from 2022-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-08 | ||||
Ogechika Heil (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-11-27 | ||||
Xavier Amaechi (until 2021-12-31) | 2001-01-05 | ||||
29 | Aaron Opoku (until 2021-07-01) | 1999-03-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-08 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2021-10-26 20:45 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-01-18 18:30 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-03-02 18:30 |
3 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-04-19 20:45 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |