Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Dabrowski (from 2021-12-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | ||||
Jan Zimmermann (until 2021-11-29) | 1979-10-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ron-Robert Zieler (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-02-12 | |||
1 | Martin Hansen (until 2022-08-01) | 1990-06-15 | |||
33 | Marlon Sundermann (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-05-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
5 | Simon Falette (until 2021-08-16) | 1992-02-19 | |||
21 | Sei Muroya (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-05-05 | |||
23 | Luka Krajnc (from 2021-08-23) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-09-19 | |||
23 | Baris Basdas (until 2021-07-21) | 1990-01-17 | |||
25 | Jannik Dehm (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-05-02 | |||
28 | Marcel Franke (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-04-05 | |||
31 | Julian Borner (from 2021-08-02) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Niklas Hult (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-02-13 | |||
6 | Tom Trybull (from 2021-08-27) (until 2022-01-30) | 1993-03-09 | |||
8 | Mike Frantz (until 2022-06-30) | 1986-10-14 | |||
10 | Sebastian Ernst (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-03-04 | |||
11 | Linton Maina (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-06-23 | |||
13 | Dominik Kaiser (until 2022-06-30) | 1988-09-16 | |||
20 | Philipp Ochs (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-04-17 | |||
24 | Marc Lamti (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-28 | |||
27 | Tim Walbrecht (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-18 | |||
29 | Gaël Ondoua (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-11-04 | |||
35 | Mark Diemers (from 2022-01-04) (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-10-11 | |||
35 | Florent Muslija (until 2022-01-01) | 1998-07-06 | |||
37 | Sebastian Kerk (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-17 | |||
40 | Lawrence Ennali (from 2021-07-15) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Patrick Twumasi (until 2022-02-02) | 1994-05-09 | |||
9 | Hendrik Weydandt (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-07-16 | |||
14 | Maximilian Beier (from 2021-08-19) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-10-17 | |||
15 | Cedric Teuchert (from 2022-01-02) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-01-14 | |||
17 | Lukas Hinterseer (from 2021-08-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-03-28 | |||
17 | Marvin Ducksch (until 2021-08-25) | 1994-03-07 | |||
18 | Franck Evina (until 2023-01-30) | 2000-07-05 | |||
19 | Valmir Sulejmani (until 2022-01-30) | 1996-02-01 | |||
22 | Sebastian Stolze (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-29 | |||
29 | Simon Stehle (until 2021-08-02) | 2001-09-17 | |||
33 | Moussa Doumbouya (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-12-12 | |||
38 | Mick Gudra (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-01 | |||
40 | Orrin McKinze Gaines II (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-03-02 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Simon Stehle (from 2021-08-02) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-07 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-10-27 20:45 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-01-19 18:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-03-02 18:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |