Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dirk Orlishausen | 1982-08-15 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jens Hartel (until 2022-11-06) | 1969-06-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Markus Kolke (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-08-18 | |||
22 | Luis Klatte (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-03-01 | |||
30 | Ben Alexander Voll (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-12-09 | |||
38 | Elias Höftmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sven Sonnenberg (until 2021-07-31) | 1999-01-19 | ||||
2 | Timo Becker (from 2022-01-20) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-03-25 | |||
3 | Julian Riedel (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-08-10 | |||
4 | Damian Rossbach | 1993-02-27 | |||
7 | Nico Neidhart | 1994-09-27 | |||
13 | Paul Wiese (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-08-28 | |||
15 | Nils Fröling (from 2022-01-01) | 2000-04-20 | |||
16 | Ryan Malone (from 2021-07-20) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-08-11 | |||
23 | Jonathan Meier (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-11-11 | |||
25 | Thomas Meissner (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-03-26 | |||
27 | Calogero Rizzuto (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-01-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Simon Rhein (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-18 | |||
6 | Bjorn Rother (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-07-29 | |||
8 | Bentley Baxter Bahn (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-08-28 | |||
10 | Haris Duljevic (from 2021-09-12) (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-11-16 | |||
14 | Svante Ingelsson (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-14 | |||
17 | Hanno Behrens (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
19 | Manuel Farrona-Pulido (until 2021-08-30) | 1993-05-01 | |||
20 | Lukas Scherff (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-07-14 | |||
21 | Nik Omladic (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-08-21 | |||
24 | Jan Lohmannsroben (until 2021-08-31) | 1991-04-21 | |||
28 | Maurice Litka (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-02 | |||
34 | Lukas Frode (from 2021-08-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-23 | |||
38 | Tobias Schwede (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Michel Ulrich (from 2022-06-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-15 | ||||
9 | Ridge Munsy (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-07-09 | |||
11 | Streli Mamba (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-06-17 | |||
13 | Kevin Schumacher (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-12-24 | |||
17 | Gian Luca Schulz (until 2021-08-26) | 1999-01-14 | |||
18 | John Verhoek (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-25 | |||
19 | Robin Meissner (from 2022-01-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-10-08 | |||
26 | Danylo Sikan (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-04-16 | |||
33 | Theo Martens (until 2023-01-31) | 2003-01-20 | |||
39 | Pascal Breier (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-02-02 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Luca Horn (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-12-19 | ||||
Oliver Daedlow (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-06-29 | ||||
Gian Luca Schulz (from 2021-08-26) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-08 18:30 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2021-10-27 20:45 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-01-19 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |