Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Kronenberg (until 2022-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christian Streich (until 2024-06-30) | 1965-06-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Lars Vossler (until 2024-06-30) | 1976-03-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Noah Atubolu | 2002-05-25 | |||
1 | Benjamin Uphoff (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-08-08 | |||
21 | Noah Atubolu (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-25 | |||
26 | Mark Flekken (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-06-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Hugo Siquet (from 2022-01-01) (until 2024-07-23) | 2002-07-09 | |||
3 | Philipp Lienhart | 1996-07-11 | |||
4 | Nico Schlotterbeck (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-12-01 | |||
5 | Manuel Gulde | 1991-02-12 | |||
5 | Manuel Gulde (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-02-12 | |||
17 | Lukas Kubler | 1992-08-30 | |||
23 | Dominique Heintz (until 2021-12-31) | 1993-08-15 | |||
24 | Kimberly Ezekwem (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-06-19 | |||
25 | Kiliann Sildillia (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-05-16 | |||
30 | Christian Gunter | 1993-02-28 | |||
30 | Christian Gunter (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-02-28 | |||
31 | Keven Schlotterbeck (until 2023-01-02) | 1997-04-28 | |||
50 | Tan-Kenneth Leka-Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-06-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Patrick Kammerbauer (from 2021-07-05) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-11 | ||||
7 | Jonathan Schmid (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-06-26 | |||
8 | Maximilian Eggestein (from 2021-08-18) | 1996-12-08 | |||
8 | Maximilian Eggestein (from 2021-08-18) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-12-08 | |||
8 | Baptiste Santamaría (until 2021-08-16) | 1995-03-09 | |||
19 | Janik Haberer (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-04-02 | |||
22 | Roland Sallai | 1997-05-22 | |||
22 | Roland Sallai (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-05-22 | |||
27 | Nicolas Hofler | 1990-03-09 | |||
27 | Nicolas Hofler (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
29 | Woo-Yeong Jeong (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-09-20 | |||
32 | Vincenzo Grifo | 1993-04-07 | |||
32 | Vincenzo Grifo (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-04-07 | |||
33 | Noah Weisshaupt (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-09-20 | |||
33 | Noah Weisshaupt (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-20 | |||
36 | Yannik Engelhardt (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-02-07 | |||
36 | Yannik Keitel (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-02-15 | |||
54 | Mika Baur (from 2022-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-07-09 | |||
61 | Robert Wagner (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-07-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Vincent Vermeij (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-08-09 | ||||
9 | Lucas Holer | 1994-07-10 | |||
9 | Lucas Holer (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-07-10 | |||
11 | Ermedin Demirovic (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-03-25 | |||
18 | Nils Petersen (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-12-06 | |||
20 | Kevin Schade (until 2023-01-04) | 2001-11-27 | |||
45 | Nishan Burkart (until 2022-08-30) | 2000-01-31 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marvin Pieringer (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-10-04 | ||||
Lino Tempelmann (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-02-02 | ||||
Niclas Thiede (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-04-14 | ||||
Carlo Boukhalfa (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-05-03 | ||||
24 | Gian-Luca Itter (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-08 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2021-10-26 20:45 |
2 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-01-19 20:45 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-03-02 20:45 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-04-19 20:45 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2022-05-21 20:00 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |