Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lukas Kwasniok | 1981-06-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Moritz Schulze (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-03-22 | |||
17 | Leopold Zingerle (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-10 | |||
21 | Jannik Huth (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-04-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Uwe Hunemeier (until 2023-06-30) | 1986-01-09 | |||
3 | Frederic Ananou (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-09-20 | |||
4 | Jasper van der Werff (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-12-09 | |||
12 | Jesse Edem Tugbenyo (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-08-07 | |||
13 | Robin Yalcin (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-25 | |||
24 | Jannis Heuer (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-07-29 | |||
25 | Marcel Correia (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-05-16 | |||
28 | Jonas Carls (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-25 | |||
29 | Jamilu Collins (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-08-05 | |||
40 | Justus Henke (from 2021-07-21) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-06-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Luca Marseiler (until 2021-08-31) | 1997-02-18 | ||||
Antony Evans Antony Evans (until 2021-08-20) | 1998-09-23 | ||||
6 | Marco Schuster (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-10-10 | |||
8 | Ron Schallenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-10-06 | |||
9 | Kai Proger (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-05-15 | |||
10 | Julian Justvan (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | |||
15 | Soufiane El-Faouzi (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-07-13 | |||
16 | Johannes Dorfler (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-08-23 | |||
20 | Pascal Steinwender (until 2021-08-31) | 1996-08-02 | |||
22 | Marco Stiepermann (from 2021-08-17) (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-02-09 | |||
23 | Maximilian Thalhammer (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-07-10 | |||
27 | Marvin Cuni (from 2021-09-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-07-10 | |||
30 | Florent Muslija (from 2022-01-02) (until 2024-01-25) | 1998-07-06 | |||
31 | Philipp Klement (from 2022-01-13) (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-09-09 | |||
38 | Adrian Oeynhausen (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
John Iredale (until 2021-08-26) | 1999-01-08 | ||||
5 | Marcel Mehlem (until 2023-01-30) | 1995-03-01 | |||
7 | Prince Osei Owusu (until 2022-01-13) | 1997-01-07 | |||
11 | Sven Michel (until 2022-01-31) | 1990-07-15 | |||
14 | Kelvin Ofori (from 2021-08-11) (until 2023-02-03) | 2001-07-27 | |||
18 | Dennis Srbeny (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-05-05 | |||
19 | Kemal Ademi (from 2022-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-01-23 | |||
35 | Fabrice Hartmann (until 2022-01-02) | 2001-03-02 | |||
36 | Felix Platte | 1996-02-11 | |||
verliehen | |||||
John Iredale (from 2021-08-26) (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-08 | ||||
Luca Marseiler (from 2021-08-31) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2021-08-06 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |