Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Worle (until 2023-06-30) | 1982-02-11 | ||||
Holger Bachthaler (until 2022-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Niclas Heimann (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-03-12 | |||
12 | Marvin Seybold | 2001-11-26 | |||
39 | Christian Ortag | 1995-01-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Milan Petrovic (from 2021-07-22) (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-11-18 | |||
5 | Johannes Reichert | 1991-07-02 | |||
6 | Thomas Geyer | 1991-03-06 | |||
7 | Bastian Allgeier | 2002-02-18 | |||
15 | Marcel Schmidts (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-06-29 | |||
27 | Micha Bareis (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-03-25 | |||
32 | Jonas Kehl (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-02-26 | |||
42 | Roman Reinelt (from 2021-07-22) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-01-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ronan Alan Kratt (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-09-02 | ||||
8 | Adrian Beck (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-06-09 | |||
18 | Lennart Stoll | 1996-05-03 | |||
19 | Robin Heusser (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-05-23 | |||
20 | Fabian Benko (from 2021-08-05) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-05 | |||
21 | Nicolas Jann (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-03-21 | |||
23 | Nicolas Wahling (from 2021-07-30) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-08-24 | |||
26 | Philipp Maier (from 2021-07-30) | 1994-06-14 | |||
26 | Jannik Rochelt (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-09-27 | |||
28 | Lukas Kiefer (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-04-25 | |||
29 | Aiden Mesias (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | ||||
30 | Michael Heilig (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-07-05 | |||
33 | Simon Klostermann (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-14 | |||
37 | Finn Paul (from 2022-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Lukas Sonnenwald (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-09 | ||||
2 | Batuhan Dikmen (from 2022-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 2003-02-07 | |||
9 | Phil Harres (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-15 | |||
10 | Ardian Morina (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-11-23 | |||
11 | Anton Fink (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-07-31 | |||
14 | Levin Kundruweit (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-01-03 | |||
22 | Cedric Guarino (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-08-22 | |||
31 | Tobias Ruhle (until 2024-01-30) | 1991-02-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2021-08-07 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |