Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Steffen (until 2023-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | ||||
Raphael Duarte (from 2022-03-19) (until 2022-03-20) | 1996-06-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rudi Thommes (from 2022-02-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1968-12-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frank Lehmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-04-29 | |||
20 | Nicolas Kristof | 1999-12-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Luca-Falk Menke (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-18 | |||
4 | Kevin Conrad (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-08-10 | |||
5 | Laurin von Piechowski (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-02-22 | |||
19 | Manuel Kober (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-02-11 | |||
23 | Carlo Sickinger (from 2022-01-26) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-07-29 | |||
27 | Fabian Baumgartel (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-07-07 | |||
29 | Maurice Neubauer (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-04-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Patryk Dragon (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-04-11 | |||
7 | Manuel Feil | 1994-10-08 | |||
8 | Felix Muller (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-27 | |||
10 | Sinan Tekerci (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-22 | |||
14 | Robin Fellhauer | 1998-01-21 | |||
17 | Yannik Haupts (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-04-11 | |||
18 | Semih Sahin | 1999-12-22 | |||
21 | Eros Dacaj (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-09 | |||
22 | Israel Suero Fernandez (until 2023-01-30) | 1994-04-12 | |||
25 | Sebastian Saftig (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-02-05 | |||
26 | Charles Elie Laprevotte (until 2022-08-23) | 1992-10-04 | |||
32 | Gabriel Weiss (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-02-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Valdrin Mustafa (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-11 | |||
11 | Nico Karger (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-02-01 | |||
24 | Luca Schnellbacher | 1994-05-06 | |||
30 | Jean Koffi (until 2024-06-30) | 1986-06-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-08 15:30 |
7 : 8 PSO |
Schema Compare |