Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lasse Otremba (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Son Schwarze (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-09-28 | ||||
Thilo Popken (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-01-26 | ||||
11 | Jannik Schoon (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-02-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Phillip Onnen (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-03-06 | ||||
Carsten Abbes (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-12-16 | ||||
Fynn Friedrichs (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-04-27 | ||||
2 | Tassilo Thiele (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-23 | |||
16 | Nils Frenzel (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-09-29 | |||
22 | Justin Tjardes (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-12-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Moritz Brinkmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-26 | ||||
Mika Nienaber (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-11-25 | ||||
Simon Wollesen (until 2022-06-30) | |||||
Nico Gereke (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-01-26 | ||||
Thomas Mennicke (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-12-28 | ||||
Tim Janssen (until 2022-06-30) | 1999-04-18 | ||||
7 | Lennart Blomer (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-04-26 | |||
8 | Sven Lameyer (until 2022-06-30) | 2000-10-31 | |||
15 | Lennart Güthoff (until 2022-06-30) | 2002-03-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
André Jädtke (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-08-22 | ||||
Simon Brinkmann (until 2022-06-30) | 2001-01-26 | ||||
Vafing Jabateh (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-06-09 | ||||
15 | Janek de Buhr (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-08-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2021-08-08 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |