Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Urs Fischer (until 2023-11-15) | 1966-02-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Lennart Grill (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-25 | ||||
1 | Frederik Ronnow | 1992-08-04 | |||
1 | Yannic Stein (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-17 | |||
12 | Jakob Busk (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-09-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Rick van Drongelen (until 2022-09-01) | 1998-12-20 | ||||
3 | Paul Jaeckel (until 2024-08-29) | 1998-07-22 | |||
4 | Diogo Leite | 1999-01-23 | |||
5 | Danilho Doekhi | 1998-06-30 | |||
18 | Josip Juranović (from 2023-01-22) | 1995-08-16 | |||
23 | Niko Giesselmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-26 | |||
25 | Timo Baumgartl (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-03-04 | |||
26 | Jérôme Roussillon (from 2023-01-14) | 1993-01-06 | |||
26 | Tymoteusz Puchacz (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-23 | |||
28 | Christopher Trimmel | 1987-02-24 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-05-22 | |||
33 | Dominique Heintz (until 2022-08-11) | 1993-08-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Aljoscha Kemlein (until 2024-01-07) | 2004-08-02 | ||||
Pawel Wszolek (until 2022-07-30) | 1992-04-30 | ||||
2 | Morten Thorsby (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-05-05 | |||
6 | Julian Ryerson (until 2023-01-18) | 1997-11-17 | |||
7 | Levin Oztunali (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | |||
8 | Rani Khedira (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-01-27 | |||
13 | András Schäfer | 1999-04-13 | |||
14 | Paul Seguin (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | |||
16 | Tim Luis Maciejewski (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-05 | |||
19 | Janik Haberer | 1994-04-02 | |||
20 | Aïssa Laïdouni (from 2023-01-27) (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-12-13 | |||
21 | Tim Skarke (until 2023-01-24) | 1996-09-07 | |||
24 | Genki Haraguchi (until 2023-01-30) | 1991-05-09 | |||
30 | Kevin Mohwald (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-03 | |||
35 | Fabio Schneider (until 2023-01-05) | 2002-07-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Andreas Voglsammer (until 2022-08-12) | 1992-01-09 | |||
10 | Sven Michel (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-07-15 | |||
17 | Kevin Behrens (until 2024-01-31) | 1991-02-03 | |||
27 | Sheraldo Becker (until 2024-01-17) | 1995-02-09 | |||
32 | Milos Pantovic (until 2023-08-28) | 1996-07-07 | |||
40 | Jamie Leweling (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-02-26 | |||
45 | Theoson-Jordan Siebatcheu (until 2023-08-31) | 1996-04-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Keita Endo (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-22 | ||||
Dominique Heintz (from 2022-08-11) (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-08-15 | ||||
Rick van Drongelen (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-12-20 | ||||
Laurenz Dehl (from 2023-01-04) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-12-12 | ||||
Tim Skarke (from 2023-01-24) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-07 | ||||
Laurenz Dehl (until 2023-01-03) | 2001-12-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2022-08-01 18:01 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-10-19 20:45 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-01-31 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-04-04 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |