Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Farke (until 2023-06-30) | 1976-10-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Maximilian Brüll (from 2022-11-11) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-08-26 | ||||
1 | Jonas Omlin (from 2023-01-20) | 1994-01-10 | |||
1 | Yann Sommer (until 2023-01-19) | 1988-12-17 | |||
21 | Tobias Sippel | 1988-03-22 | |||
33 | Moritz Nicolas (until 2022-08-17) | 1997-10-21 | |||
41 | Jan Olschowsky (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-11-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Poulsen (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-13 | ||||
Tom Gaal (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-03 | ||||
3 | Kou Itakura | 1997-01-27 | |||
4 | Mamadou Doucoure (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | |||
5 | Marvin Friedrich | 1995-12-13 | |||
15 | Louis Beyer (until 2022-09-01) | 2000-05-19 | |||
18 | Stefan Lainer (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-02-27 | |||
20 | Luca Netz | 2003-05-15 | |||
24 | Tony Jantschke (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-04-07 | |||
25 | Ramy Bensebaini (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-04-16 | |||
26 | Lukas Ullrich (from 2023-01-30) | 2004-03-16 | |||
29 | Joseph Scally | 2002-12-31 | |||
30 | Nico Elvedi | 1996-09-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Christoph Kramer (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-02-19 | |||
8 | Julian Weigl (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-08 | |||
11 | Hannes Wolf (until 2024-01-16) | 1999-04-16 | |||
13 | Lars Stindl (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-08-26 | |||
17 | Kouadio Manu Kone (until 2024-08-30) | 2001-05-17 | |||
19 | Nathan Ngoumou (from 2022-08-30) | 2000-03-14 | |||
23 | Jonas Hofmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-07-14 | |||
26 | Torben Musel (until 2023-01-30) | 1999-07-25 | |||
27 | Rocco Reitz (until 2023-01-17) | 2002-05-29 | |||
32 | Florian Neuhaus (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-16 | |||
34 | Conor Noss (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Patrick Herrmann (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-02-12 | |||
10 | Marcus Thuram (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-08-06 | |||
14 | Alassane Plea | 1993-03-10 | |||
48 | Semir Telalovic (until 2023-09-01) | 1999-12-23 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Yvandro Sanches (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-05-24 | ||||
Jonas Thomas Kersken (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-09-01 | ||||
Moritz Nicolas (from 2022-08-17) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-10-21 | ||||
Louis Beyer (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-05-19 | ||||
Rocco Reitz (from 2023-01-17) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-05-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-07-31 15:31 |
1 : 9 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-10-18 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |