Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Torsten Gutschow (until 2023-06-30) | 1962-07-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Malte Seemann (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-05-15 | |||
1 | Malte Seemann (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-05-15 | |||
21 | Damian Schobert (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-06-04 | |||
22 | Bennet Glinder (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-09-15 | |||
33 | Jasin Jashari (from 2023-03-17) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-11-09 | |||
33 | Jasin Jashari (from 2023-04-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Sajieh Jaber (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-08-08 | |||
2 | Sajieh Jaber (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-08-08 | |||
4 | Daniel Kunkel (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-03 | |||
4 | Daniel Kunkel (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-04-03 | |||
5 | Dylan Burke (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-11-12 | |||
9 | Kevin Kling (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-01 | |||
17 | Nicolas Fenski (from 2023-01-27) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-03 | |||
18 | Fabio Orlick | 2002-12-07 | |||
18 | Fabio Orlick (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-12-07 | |||
19 | David Dere (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-10 | |||
23 | Sebastian Kmiec (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-06-16 | |||
23 | Justin Gröger (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-09-27 | |||
25 | Jannis Niestädt (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-09-07 | |||
27 | Jan-Luca Warm | 1999-05-28 | |||
28 | Justin Sauermilch (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-03-09 | |||
28 | Justin Sauermilch (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ugo-Mario Nobile (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-10 | ||||
Keon Lee (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-04 | ||||
6 | Lukas Muszong (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-02-16 | |||
7 | Ali Wazneh (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
8 | Mats Kaiser (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-08-22 | |||
9 | Herdi Bukusu (from 2022-10-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-04-03 | |||
17 | Alexander Arnhold (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-06-20 | |||
24 | Mats Kaiser (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-08-22 | |||
27 | Jan-Luca Warm (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-05-28 | |||
28 | Atsushi Waki (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-02-08 | |||
30 | Allah Aid Hamid (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-28 | |||
32 | Bjarne Kasper (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-08-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Nikky Goguadze (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-15 | |||
8 | Onur Uzun (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-12 | |||
9 | Herdi Bukusu (from 2022-10-08) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-03 | |||
10 | Sebastian Kurkiewicz (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-08-24 | |||
10 | Marco Schultz (from 2023-01-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-02-11 | |||
11 | Sadrak-Kalemba Nankishi (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-04-06 | |||
14 | Lamine Diop (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-05-18 | |||
26 | Mamadou Ibrahima Diop (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-10-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-07-31 13:01 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |