Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kristian Arambasic (until 2023-06-30) | 1977-08-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Phil Wilhelm (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-06-20 | ||||
Yannick Olschewski (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-16 | ||||
1 | Maciej Czyzniewski (until 2023-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
21 | Flemming Niemann (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-08-07 | |||
28 | Ole Bahr (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-12-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Georgios Tsapakidis (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-12-21 | ||||
Nick Kaperkon (from 2023-01-05) (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
3 | Daniel Haritonov (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-04-14 | |||
5 | Denis Vukancic (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-16 | |||
6 | Jan Roschlaub (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-12-11 | |||
17 | Julijan Popovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-06-15 | |||
23 | Kerem Sahan (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-04-23 | |||
25 | Angelos Argyris (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-05-06 | |||
25 | Mustafa Fatiras (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-06-12 | |||
26 | Alexander Nandzik (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-09-12 | |||
27 | Landry Imboula (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
31 | Pierre Becken (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-09-28 | |||
32 | Marcel Schillmöller (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Firas Romdhane (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-08-03 | ||||
Johannes Buhler (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-07-26 | ||||
Felix Bauhus (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-12-24 | ||||
Kyrylo Kozin (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
7 | Niklas Kiene (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-18 | |||
10 | Josip Tomic (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-16 | |||
10 | Ebrima Jobe (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-02-06 | |||
13 | Ka-ram Han (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-02-09 | |||
14 | Tony Rudy Lesueur (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-08-19 | |||
17 | Ismet Osmani (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-12-21 | |||
17 | Alexander Schmitt (from 2023-01-26) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-16 | |||
22 | Leonardo Cristescu (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-12-05 | |||
22 | Emeraude Betani-Baku (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-01 | |||
23 | Moussa Alawie (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-11-29 | |||
24 | Lovro Sindik (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-12 | |||
27 | Alessio Arambasic (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-08 | |||
30 | Kubilay Buyukdemir (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-08-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Bocar Djumo (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-08-21 | |||
9 | Shamsu Mansaray (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-17 | |||
9 | Malik Memisevic (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-05-20 | |||
11 | Serhat Koruk (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-05-04 | |||
20 | Kevin Coleman (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-01 | |||
30 | Alexander Schlobohm (from 2023-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-08-12 | |||
33 | Moody Chana (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-07-31 13:01 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |