Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Markus Anfang (until 2024-04-20) | 1974-06-12 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Florian Junge (from 2023-04-21) (until 2023-04-23) | 1986-01-03 | ||||
Athletiktrainer | |||||
Matthias Grahe (until 2024-06-30) | 1968-11-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Niklas Heeger (until 2023-01-30) | 2000-01-07 | ||||
1 | Sven Muller (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-16 | |||
22 | Anton Mitrjuschkin (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-08 | |||
23 | Stefan Drljaca (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-04-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jonas Kühn (until 2022-08-24) | 2002-03-20 | ||||
2 | guram-giorbelidze Guram Giorbelidse (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-25 | |||
2 | Kyu-hyun Park (from 2022-07-08) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-14 | |||
4 | Tim Knipping (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-11-24 | |||
8 | Jonathan Meier (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-11-11 | |||
15 | Claudio Kammerknecht | 1999-07-07 | |||
16 | Robin Becker (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-01-18 | |||
17 | Kyrylo Melichenko (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-06-07 | |||
22 | Michael Akoto (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-10-03 | |||
23 | Antonis Aidonis (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-05-22 | |||
31 | Jakob Lewald (from 2022-08-22) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-26 | |||
36 | Max Kulke (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-11-10 | |||
39 | Kevin Ehlers (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jonas Oehmichen (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-03-03 | ||||
Jongmin Seo (until 2023-02-06) | 2002-05-09 | ||||
Sven Muller (until 2022-09-06) | 1980-04-04 | ||||
3 | Akaki Gogia (from 2022-08-29) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
5 | Yannick Stark (until 2022-08-24) | 1990-10-28 | |||
7 | Panagiotis Vlachodimos (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-12 | |||
11 | Jan Shcherbakovski (until 2023-01-31) | 2001-03-24 | |||
19 | Luca Herrmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | |||
20 | Julius Kade (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-05-20 | |||
27 | Niklas Hauptmann (from 2022-08-31) | 1996-06-27 | |||
28 | Paul Will (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-01 | |||
36 | Max Kulke (until 2023-02-06) | 2000-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Paul Lehmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-07-22 | ||||
Julius Hoffmann (until 2023-02-06) | 2004-04-30 | ||||
9 | Dennis Borkowski (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-26 | |||
10 | Patrick Weihrauch (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-03 | |||
17 | Oliver Batista Meier (until 2024-02-02) | 2001-02-16 | |||
21 | Jakob Lemmer (from 2023-01-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-04-26 | |||
30 | Stefan Kutschke | 1988-11-03 | |||
32 | Christian Conteh (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-27 | |||
33 | Manuel Schaffler (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Phil Harres (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2022-07-29 18:01 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |