Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Oliver Glasner (until 2023-06-04) | 1974-08-28 | ||||
Michael Angerschmid (from 2023-05-12) (until 2023-05-14) | 1974-02-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kevin Trapp | 1990-07-08 | |||
31 | Jens Grahl | 1988-09-22 | |||
40 | Diant Ramaj (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-19 | |||
41 | Simon Simoni (from 2023-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-07-14 | |||
43 | Matteo Bignetti (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Fynn Otto (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-08 | ||||
2 | Obite Evan N'Dicka (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-20 | |||
4 | Jerome Onguene (until 2023-01-05) | 1997-12-22 | |||
5 | Hrvoje Smolcic (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-08-17 | |||
18 | Almamy Toure (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-04-28 | |||
24 | Aurélio Buta (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-02-10 | |||
25 | Christopher Lenz (until 2023-08-30) | 1994-09-22 | |||
31 | Philipp Max (from 2023-01-31) (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-30 | |||
33 | Luca Pellegrini (from 2022-08-14) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-07 | |||
35 | Tuta | 1999-07-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Faride Alidou (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-07-18 | ||||
Pexton Aaronson (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
6 | Kristijan Jakic (until 2024-01-18) | 1997-05-14 | |||
10 | Filip Kostic (until 2022-08-11) | 1992-11-01 | |||
17 | Sebastian Rode (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-10-11 | |||
20 | Makoto Hasebe (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
22 | Timothy Chandler | 1990-03-29 | |||
23 | Jens Petter Hauge (until 2022-08-16) | 1999-10-12 | |||
26 | Eric Ebimbe (from 2022-08-21) | 2000-11-21 | |||
27 | Mario Gotze | 1992-06-03 | |||
28 | Marcel Wenig (until 2024-01-08) | 2004-05-04 | |||
29 | Jesper Lindstrom (until 2023-08-29) | 2000-02-29 | |||
45 | Mehdi Loune | 2004-05-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ali Akman (until 2022-08-07) | 2002-04-18 | ||||
7 | Ajdin Hrustic (until 2022-08-31) | 1996-05-05 | |||
9 | Randal Kolo Muani (until 2023-09-02) | 1998-12-05 | |||
19 | Santos Borre (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-15 | |||
21 | Lucas Alario (until 2024-01-04) | 1992-10-08 | |||
36 | Ansgar Knauff | 2002-01-10 | |||
38 | Enrique Herrero García (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-01-28 | |||
39 | Goncalo Paciencia (until 2022-08-05) | 1994-08-01 | |||
46 | Dario Gebuhr (from 2023-04-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-06 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Antonio Foti (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-11-03 | ||||
Ali Akman (from 2022-08-07) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-04-18 | ||||
Jens Petter Hauge (from 2022-08-16) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-12 | ||||
Ragnar Ache (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2022-08-01 20:46 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-10-18 18:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-02-07 20:45 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-04-04 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2023-05-03 20:45 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2023-06-03 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |