Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Sebald | 1996-07-27 | |||
12 | Elias Bethke | 2003-03-21 | |||
31 | Corbinian Moye (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-12-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Edgar Kaizer (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-04-07 | ||||
17 | Jonas Hildebrandt (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-12-08 | |||
20 | Axel Borgmann | 1994-07-08 | |||
24 | Jan Koch (until 2022-07-30) | 1995-11-04 | |||
26 | Jonas Bohmert (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-03 | |||
27 | Dennis Slamar | 1994-09-08 | |||
31 | Paul Milde | 1995-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Paul-Levi Wagner (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-14 | ||||
5 | Dominik Pelivan | 1996-06-08 | |||
6 | Jonas Hofmann | 1997-02-07 | |||
7 | Ali Abu-Alfa (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-28 | |||
8 | Joshua Putze | 1994-12-02 | |||
11 | Nicolas Wahling (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-08-24 | |||
19 | Niklas Geisler (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-12-10 | |||
21 | Tobias Eisenhuth (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-09-21 | |||
22 | Niclas Erlbeck (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-10 | |||
23 | Maximilian Krauss | 1996-11-24 | |||
23 | Kentu Malcolm Badu (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-06-23 | |||
33 | Jan Shcherbakovski (from 2023-02-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-24 | |||
36 | Janis Juckel | 2004-07-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Timmy Thiele (from 2023-01-01) | 1991-07-31 | |||
9 | Tim Heike (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-02-25 | |||
10 | Maximilian Oesterhelweg (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-07-21 | |||
13 | Eric Hottmann (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-02-08 | |||
14 | Tobias Hasse | 1996-01-03 | |||
verliehen | |||||
16 | Arnel Kujovic (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-03-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2022-08-01 18:01 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |