Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Pavel Dotchev (from 2022-12-07) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Joti Stamatopoulos (from 2023-05-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 1972-12-10 | ||||
Timo Rost (until 2022-09-20) | 1978-08-29 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Carsten Muller (from 2022-09-20) (until 2022-11-30) | 1971-10-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Martin Mannel | 1988-03-16 | |||
25 | Philipp Klewin (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-30 | |||
36 | Lukas Sedlak (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-09-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Felix Göttlicher (until 2022-08-23) | 2002-03-20 | ||||
4 | Jannis Lang (until 2022-08-31) | 2002-07-12 | |||
5 | Korbinian Burger (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-04-27 | |||
6 | Alexander Sorge (until 2023-09-01) | 1993-04-21 | |||
12 | Franco Schädlich (from 2023-01-05) | 2004-04-16 | |||
21 | Marco Schikora (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-09-20 | |||
22 | Niklas Jeck (until 2023-01-20) | 2001-09-18 | |||
23 | Anthony Barylla | 1997-06-01 | |||
24 | Steffen Nkansah (from 2022-07-06) | 1996-04-07 | |||
26 | Kilian Jakob (from 2022-12-19) | 1998-01-25 | |||
29 | Linus Rosenlocher | 2000-09-09 | |||
40 | Ramzi Ferjani (until 2022-08-26) | 2001-04-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Tim Danhof (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-05-05 | |||
3 | Ulrich Taffertshofer (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-02-14 | |||
8 | Tom Baumgart (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-12 | |||
13 | Erik Majetschak | 2000-03-01 | |||
17 | Philipp Riese (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-11-12 | |||
18 | Soufiane Messeguem (until 2022-07-25) | 2001-02-05 | |||
30 | Maximilian Thiel (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-02-03 | |||
31 | Nico Gorzel (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-07-29 | |||
33 | Ognjen Gnjatic (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-10-16 | |||
33 | Sam Francis Schreck (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-29 | |||
34 | Marvin Stefaniak | 1995-02-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Ivan Knezevic (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-14 | |||
9 | Antonio Jonjic (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-02 | |||
10 | Dimitrij Nazarov (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-04 | |||
14 | Boris Taschtschi | 1993-07-26 | |||
14 | Jann George (until 2022-08-30) | 1992-07-31 | |||
19 | Omar Sijaric (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-11-02 | |||
20 | Lenn Jastremski (until 2023-01-30) | 2001-01-24 | |||
22 | Paul-Philipp Besong (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-10-06 | |||
32 | Elias Huth (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-02-10 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Felix Göttlicher (from 2022-08-24) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-20 | ||||
Ramzi Ferjani (from 2022-08-27) (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-11 | ||||
25 | Tim Kips (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-11-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-07-31 18:01 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |