Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Kollner (from 2023-04-05) (until 2024-05-02) | 1969-12-29 | ||||
Michael Kollner (from 2023-04-05) (until 2023-06-30) | 1969-12-29 | ||||
Guerino Capretti (from 2023-02-01) (until 2023-04-04) | 1982-02-05 | ||||
Rudiger Rehm (until 2023-01-31) | 1978-11-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Thomas Karg (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-07-26 | ||||
Maniyel Nergiz (from 2023-02-09) (until 2023-06-30) | 1983-05-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marius Funk (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-01-01 | |||
40 | Markus Ponath (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Dominik Franke (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-10-05 | |||
5 | Nico Antonitsch (until 2023-01-05) | 1991-09-30 | |||
15 | Nikola Stevanovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-09-13 | |||
16 | Visar Musliu (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-11-13 | |||
16 | Peter Kurzweg (until 2023-01-17) | 1994-02-10 | |||
17 | Calvin Brackelmann (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-22 | |||
21 | Tobias Schrock (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-12-31 | |||
31 | Justin Butler (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-23 | |||
42 | Donald Nduka (from 2023-03-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-22 | |||
45 | Thomas Rausch (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-13 | |||
47 | David Udogu (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Tim Civeja (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-04 | |||
10 | Max Dittgen (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-03-03 | |||
11 | Tobias Bech (from 2022-08-05) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-19 | |||
14 | Hans Nunoo Sarpei (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-08-22 | |||
22 | Marcel Costly (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-11-20 | |||
23 | Denis Linsmayer (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-19 | |||
25 | Arian Llugiqi (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-10-24 | |||
29 | David Kopacz (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-05-29 | |||
34 | Merlin Rohl (until 2022-08-16) | 2002-07-05 | |||
38 | Maximilian Neuberger (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-23 | |||
43 | Felix Keidel (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-06-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Patrick Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-10 | |||
13 | Valmir Sulejmani (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-01 | |||
20 | Jalen Hawkins (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-01-24 | |||
27 | Moussa Doumbouya (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-12-12 | |||
33 | Jeroen Krupa (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-04-26 | |||
37 | Pascal Testroet (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-09-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2022-08-01 18:01 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |