Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Joe Enochs (from 2023-05-10) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Mersad Selimbegovic (until 2023-05-09) | 1982-04-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dejan Stojanovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-07-19 | ||||
Jonas Urbig (from 2023-01-06) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-08-08 | ||||
21 | Thorsten Kirschbaum (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-04-20 | |||
32 | Alexander Weidinger | 1997-06-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
5 | Benedikt Gimber (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-02-19 | |||
11 | Konrad Faber (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-11-04 | |||
20 | Leon Guwara (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-06-28 | |||
23 | Steve Breitkreuz (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
24 | Scott Kennedy (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-31 | |||
28 | Sebastian Nachreiner (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-11-23 | |||
33 | Jan Elvedi (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-09-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Blendi Idrizi (from 2022-08-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-02 | ||||
Maximilian Thalhammer (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-07-10 | ||||
Lasse Gunther (from 2022-08-10) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-21 | ||||
6 | Benedikt Saller | 1992-09-22 | |||
9 | Nicklas Shipnoski (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-01-01 | |||
10 | Christian Viet | 1999-03-27 | |||
15 | Sarpreet Singh (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | |||
25 | Björn Zempelin (until 2022-08-09) | 2000-02-07 | |||
35 | Christian Schmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Dario Vizinger (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-06-06 | ||||
Oscar Schonfelder (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-02-05 | ||||
Joshua Mees (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | ||||
Jannik Graf (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-11-29 | ||||
8 | Aygun Yildirim (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-04-04 | |||
19 | Andreas Albers (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-03-23 | |||
26 | Charalambos Makridis (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-07-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-07-30 15:31 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-10-19 20:45 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |