Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alfred Kaminski (from 2023-04-17) (until 2023-06-30) | 1964-02-26 | ||||
Ersan Parlatan (from 2022-10-12) (until 2023-04-17) | 1977-08-01 | ||||
Alfred Kaminski (from 2022-09-22) (until 2022-10-12) | 1964-02-26 | ||||
Alexander Schmidt (until 2022-09-21) | 1968-10-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Angelo Tramontana (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-08-05 | ||||
21 | Maximilian Engl (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-12-31 | |||
23 | David Richter (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-17 | |||
29 | Michael Zadach (from 2023-03-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Paul Polanke (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-11 | ||||
Sebastian Zieleniecki (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-02-16 | ||||
3 | Maximilian Rossmann (from 2022-09-05) | 1995-05-06 | |||
3 | Maximilian Rossmann (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-05-06 | |||
5 | Sebastian Zieleniecki (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-02-16 | |||
8 | Maik Vetter (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-09-06 | |||
27 | Jayson Breitenbach | 1998-05-12 | |||
31 | Ronny Marcos | 1993-10-01 | |||
32 | Vincent Moreno Giesel | 2002-01-09 | |||
34 | Dino-Samuel Kurbegovic (from 2023-01-05) (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
36 | Jakob Zitzelsberger (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-01-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Can Karakus (until 2023-06-30) | |||||
2 | Shako W'Okitasombo (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-05 | |||
7 | Rafael Garcia (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-09-27 | |||
7 | Rafael Garcia (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-27 | |||
8 | Maik Vetter (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-06 | |||
10 | Semir Saric (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-09-08 | |||
10 | Benjamin Hadzic (from 2023-01-07) (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-03-04 | |||
17 | Christian Derflinger (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-02-02 | |||
17 | Christian Derflinger (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-02-02 | |||
18 | Jost Mairose (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-10-02 | |||
22 | Osarenren Okungbowa (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-05-13 | |||
25 | Bjorn Jopek (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-08-24 | |||
25 | Bjorn Jopek (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-08-24 | |||
26 | Almin Mesanovic | 2004-01-17 | |||
26 | Almin Mesanovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-01-17 | |||
35 | Damjan Balic (from 2023-03-17) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-10-02 | |||
39 | Julian Albrecht (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-08-31 | |||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
19 | Noah Vuko (from 2023-01-05) (until 2023-06-30) | ||||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Torles Knoll (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-09-13 | |||
9 | Mike Feigenspan (from 2023-01-31) (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-08-05 | |||
11 | Philipp Hosiner (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-05-15 | |||
13 | Lucas Hermes (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-23 | |||
19 | Jakob Lemmer (until 2023-01-15) | 2000-04-26 | |||
20 | Dominik Wanner (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-05-04 | |||
24 | Florent Bojaj (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-04-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-07-30 18:01 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |