Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lukas Kwasniok | 1981-06-12 | ||||
Frank Kaspari (from 2023-05-26) (until 2023-06-30) | 1970-11-03 | ||||
Frank Kaspari (from 2023-05-26) (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Moritz Schulze (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-03-22 | |||
17 | Leopold Zingerle (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-10 | |||
21 | Jannik Huth (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-04-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Uwe Hunemeier (until 2023-06-30) | 1986-01-09 | |||
3 | Bashir Humphreys (from 2023-01-27) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-15 | |||
4 | Jasper van der Werff (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-12-09 | |||
13 | Robin Yalcin (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-25 | |||
15 | Tobias Muller (until 2023-12-31) | 1994-07-08 | |||
20 | Adrian Gryszkiewicz (until 2023-01-10) | 1999-12-13 | |||
24 | Jannis Heuer (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-07-29 | |||
28 | Jonas Carls (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-25 | |||
31 | Maximilian Rohr (from 2022-08-31) (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-06-27 | |||
32 | Robin Bormuth (until 2022-08-21) | 1995-09-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Marco Schuster (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-10-10 | |||
8 | Ron Schallenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-10-06 | |||
10 | Julian Justvan (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | |||
13 | Robert Leipertz (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-02-01 | |||
20 | Filip Bilbija (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-24 | |||
23 | Raphael Obermair | 1996-04-01 | |||
26 | Sebastian Klaas | 1998-06-30 | |||
27 | Kai Klefisch (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-12-03 | |||
30 | Florent Muslija (until 2024-01-25) | 1998-07-06 | |||
33 | Marcel Hoffmeier | 1999-07-15 | |||
34 | Dawyn-Paul Donner (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-08-06 | |||
38 | Medin Kojic (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-12-09 | |||
40 | Niclas Tibor Nadj (from 2023-01-18) (until 2024-01-24) | 2000-12-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
John Iredale (from 2022-07-10) (until 2022-07-30) | 1999-01-08 | ||||
5 | Marcel Mehlem (until 2023-01-30) | 1995-03-01 | |||
7 | Richmond Tachie (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-21 | |||
9 | Marvin Pieringer (from 2022-07-28) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-04 | |||
11 | Sirlord Conteh (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-07-09 | |||
14 | Kelvin Ofori (until 2023-02-03) | 2001-07-27 | |||
18 | Dennis Srbeny (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-05-05 | |||
36 | Felix Platte | 1996-02-11 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Justus Henke (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-06-05 | ||||
Marcel Mehlem (from 2023-01-31) (until 2023-08-30) | 1995-03-01 | ||||
Robin Bormuth (from 2022-08-22) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-19 | ||||
Jesse Edem Tugbenyo (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-08-07 | ||||
Johannes Dorfler (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-08-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-07-30 15:31 |
0 : 10 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2022-10-19 18:00 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-01-31 18:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |