Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Mustafa Unal (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Leon Neaime (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-10-29 | ||||
1 | David Nreca-Bisinger (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-01-18 | |||
16 | Maximilian Otto (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-02-02 | |||
21 | Ramon Castellucci (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-03-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Malte Moos (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-02-02 | ||||
Jacob Danquah (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-06 | ||||
Enrico Krieger (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-05-22 | ||||
Marian Riedinger (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-08-24 | ||||
2 | Malte Moos (until 2023-08-30) | 1996-02-02 | |||
3 | David Kammerbauer (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-02-11 | |||
4 | Denis Zagaria (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-05-13 | |||
7 | Loris Maier (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-27 | |||
11 | Marian Riedinger (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-08-24 | |||
18 | Niklas Kolbe (until 2024-06-23) | 1996-12-27 | |||
20 | Leon Maier (until 2024-06-23) | 1999-04-27 | |||
20 | Leon Maier (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-27 | |||
25 | Paul Polauke (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-11 | |||
35 | Julian Leist (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-03-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jonas Kohler (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-08-31 | ||||
Philipp Seemann (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-09-12 | ||||
Marko Pilic (until 2024-01-01) | 2004-04-11 | ||||
6 | Ivo Colic (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-11-02 | |||
10 | Kevin Dicklhuber | 1989-03-06 | |||
15 | Nico Blank (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-04-13 | |||
24 | Torben Hohloch (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-01-12 | |||
26 | Oguzhan Kececi (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-01-14 | |||
26 | Oguzhan Kececi (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-14 | |||
28 | Lukas Kiefer | 1993-04-25 | |||
37 | Flamur Berisha | 1999-11-22 | |||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
14 | Markus Obernosterer (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-04-14 | |||
15 | Nico Blank (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-04-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Halim Eroglu (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-08-05 | ||||
Rafael Terpsiadis (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-09-10 | ||||
David Nieland (from 2022-08-05) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-28 | ||||
8 | Luigi Campagna (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-12-11 | |||
17 | Konrad Riehle | 2002-01-15 | |||
22 | David Braig | 1991-07-22 | |||
22 | Cedric Guarino (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-08-22 | |||
33 | Tyron Profis (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-05-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-07-30 18:01 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-10-18 18:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |