Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2024-09-01) | 1973-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ovid Hajou | 1983-11-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marcel Schuhen | 1993-01-13 | |||
1 | Marcel Schuhen (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-13 | |||
21 | Steve Kroll (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-05-07 | |||
30 | Alexander Brunst-Zollner | 1995-07-07 | |||
30 | Alexander Brunst-Zollner (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-07-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Thomas Isherwood (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-01-28 | |||
4 | Christoph Zimmermann | 1993-01-12 | |||
5 | Patric Pfeiffer (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-08-20 | |||
17 | Frank Ronstadt (until 2023-12-31) | 1997-07-21 | |||
20 | Jannik Muller (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-18 | |||
26 | Matthias Bader | 1997-06-17 | |||
32 | Fabian Holland | 1990-07-11 | |||
38 | Clemens Riedel (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-07-19 | |||
41 | Philipp Sonn (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-09-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Marvin Mehlem | 1997-09-11 | |||
8 | Fabian Schnellhardt (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-12 | |||
8 | Fabian Schnellhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-01-12 | |||
11 | Tobias Kempe | 1989-06-27 | |||
11 | Tobias Kempe (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-06-27 | |||
16 | Keanan Bennetts (from 2022-10-21) (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-09 | |||
18 | Mathias Honsak (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-12-20 | |||
19 | Emir Karic (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-06-09 | |||
23 | Klaus Gjasula | 1989-12-14 | |||
23 | Klaus Gjasula (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-12-14 | |||
28 | Yassin Ben Balla (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-02-24 | |||
33 | Braydon Manu (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-28 | |||
36 | Andre Leipold (until 2023-01-31) | 2001-11-12 | |||
44 | Nico Baier (from 2022-10-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-04-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Braydon Manu (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-03-28 | |||
9 | Phillip Tietz (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-07-09 | |||
14 | Magnus Warming (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-08-06 | |||
22 | Aaron Seydel (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-02-07 | |||
29 | Oscar Vilhelmsson (from 2022-07-10) | 2003-10-02 | |||
35 | John Peter Sesay (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-28 | |||
40 | Filip Stojilkovic (from 2023-01-31) (until 2023-12-21) | 2000-01-04 | |||
42 | Fabio Torsiello (from 2022-12-06) | 2005-02-02 | |||
42 | Fabio Torsiello (until 2023-06-30) | 2005-02-02 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Henry Jon Crosthwaite (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-10-14 | ||||
John Peter Sesay (from 2022-08-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-28 | ||||
Morten Behrens (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-04-01 | ||||
43 | Nemanja Celic (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2022-08-01 18:01 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-10-18 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-02-07 20:45 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |