Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Asif Saric (from 2023-03-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1965-01-15 | ||||
Christian Neidhart (until 2023-06-30) | 1968-10-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Theodoros Dedes (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-02-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Morten Behrens (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-04-01 | |||
23 | Jan-Christoph Bartels (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-13 | |||
30 | Lucien Hawryluk (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-10-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Marc Lutz (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-05-11 | ||||
Luca Bolay (from 2022-12-14) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-25 | ||||
2 | Niklas Sommer (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | |||
3 | Julian Riedel (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-08-10 | |||
5 | Marcel Seegert | 1994-04-29 | |||
15 | Malte Karbstein (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-01-30 | |||
18 | Laurent Jans (from 2022-08-19) (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-08-05 | |||
21 | Alexander Rossipal (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-06-06 | |||
27 | Gerrit Gohlke (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Volkan Rona (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-12 | ||||
Florian Butscher (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-29 | ||||
Johannes Dorfler (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-08-23 | ||||
4 | Adrian Malachowski (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-03-10 | |||
6 | Stefano Russo (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-06-29 | |||
8 | Fridolin Wagner (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-09-23 | |||
9 | Bentley Baxter Bahn (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-08-28 | |||
13 | Marc Schnatterer (until 2023-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
20 | Adrien Lebeau (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-07-08 | |||
25 | Baris Ekincier (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-03-24 | |||
31 | Thomas Pledl (from 2023-01-15) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-05-23 | |||
34 | Shinhyung Lee (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-02 | |||
37 | Marco Hoger (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-09-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Pascal Sohm (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-11-02 | |||
11 | Dominik Martinovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-25 | |||
22 | Marten Winkler (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-10-31 | |||
29 | Daniel Keita-Ruel (from 2022-08-18) (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-09-21 | |||
33 | Berkan Taz (until 2024-01-18) | 1998-12-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2022-07-31 18:01 |
5 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-10-18 18:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |