Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Richard Krohn (from 2023-05-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-07-15 | ||||
David Bergner (until 2023-06-30) | 1973-12-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Emre Boz (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-11-18 | ||||
1 | Marius Liesegang (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-01-07 | |||
51 | Bennett Schauer (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-04-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Nils Gans (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-02-28 | ||||
3 | Junior Eugenio Lopes (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-07-23 | |||
4 | Ismael Mansaray (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-11-17 | |||
4 | Leonard Brodersen (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-05-17 | |||
22 | Janik Jesgarzewski (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-01-26 | |||
24 | Samuel Olayisoye (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-01-02 | |||
25 | Tjorben Uphoff (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-09-08 | |||
27 | Sebastian Hertner (from 2022-09-20) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-05-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Godjes Yeboah (from 2022-07-29) (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-17 | ||||
5 | Marcus Coffie (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-01-19 | |||
6 | Ridel Monteiro (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-10-27 | |||
7 | Can Duzel (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-11-26 | |||
8 | Emanuel Mirchev (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-02-09 | |||
9 | Ede Mika Zimmermann (from 2023-05-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-03-09 | |||
10 | Linus Meyer (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-07 | |||
10 | Erolind Krasniqi (from 2023-01-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-15 | |||
14 | Francis Amaechi Onwuzo (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-07-07 | |||
14 | Luis Angel Coordes (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-01-02 | |||
18 | Fabian Graudenz (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-16 | |||
19 | Fabian Istefo (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-10-29 | |||
21 | Pascal Steinwender (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-08-02 | |||
23 | Max Brandt (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-06-02 | |||
28 | Nick Brisevac (from 2023-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-01-13 | |||
33 | Yannick Zummack (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-03-26 | |||
35 | Diamant Berisha (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-22 | |||
37 | Kevin Weidlich (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-10-04 | |||
47 | Gazi Siala (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-11-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
16 | Maik Lukowicz (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-02-01 | |||
17 | Ole Wohlers (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-07-23 | |||
20 | Mohamed Abd El Aal Ali (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-11-30 | |||
24 | Affamefuna-Michael Ifeadigo (from 2023-01-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-07-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2022-08-30 20:46 |
0 : 8 |
Schema Compare |