Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Niko Kovac (until 2024-03-17) | 1971-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Lino Kasten (until 2022-08-31) | 2001-01-17 | ||||
1 | Koen Casteels (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-06-25 | |||
12 | Pavao Pervan | 1987-11-13 | |||
30 | Niklas Klinger | 1995-10-13 | |||
35 | Philipp Schulze (until 2023-12-31) | 2003-01-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Luka Tomljenovic (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-07 | ||||
3 | Sebastiaan Bornauw | 1999-03-22 | |||
4 | Maxence Lacroix (until 2024-08-29) | 2000-04-06 | |||
5 | Micky van de Ven (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-04-19 | |||
6 | Paulo Otavio (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-11-23 | |||
8 | Nicolas Cozza (from 2023-01-25) (until 2024-02-01) | 1999-01-08 | |||
15 | Jérôme Roussillon (until 2023-01-13) | 1993-01-06 | |||
19 | Kevin Mbabu (until 2022-07-26) | 1995-04-19 | |||
38 | Bartol Franjic (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-01-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
David Odogu (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2006-06-03 | ||||
2 | Kilian Fischer | 2000-10-12 | |||
7 | Josip Brekalo (until 2023-01-28) | 1998-06-23 | |||
8 | Aster Vranckx (until 2022-09-01) | 2002-10-04 | |||
11 | Renato Steffen (until 2022-08-29) | 1991-11-03 | |||
18 | Dzenan Pejcinovic (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-02-15 | |||
20 | Bote Baku | 1998-04-08 | |||
22 | Felix Nmecha (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-10-10 | |||
27 | Maximilian Arnold | 1994-05-27 | |||
29 | Josuha Guilavogui (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-09-19 | |||
31 | Yannick Gerhardt | 1994-03-13 | |||
32 | Mattias Svanberg (from 2022-07-10) | 1999-01-05 | |||
39 | Patrick Wimmer | 2001-05-30 | |||
40 | Kevin Paredes | 2003-05-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Max Kruse (until 2022-11-28) | 1988-03-19 | |||
10 | Lukas Nmecha | 1998-12-14 | |||
16 | Jakub Kaminski | 2002-06-05 | |||
17 | Maximilian Philipp (until 2023-01-30) | 1994-03-01 | |||
21 | Bartosz Bialek (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-11-11 | |||
23 | Jonas Wind | 1999-02-07 | |||
26 | Ulysses Llanez (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-04-02 | |||
28 | Luca Waldschmidt (until 2023-06-30) | 1996-05-19 | |||
28 | Dodi Lukebakio (until 2022-07-01) | 1997-09-24 | |||
33 | Omar Marmoush (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-02-07 | |||
36 | Lukas Ambros (from 2023-01-01) (until 2023-09-01) | 2004-06-05 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Tim Siersleben (until 2023-06-30) | 2000-03-09 | ||||
Marin Pongracic (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-09-11 | ||||
Anselmo Garcia MacNulty (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-02-19 | ||||
Fabio Di-Michele-Sanchez (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-03-14 | ||||
Aster Vranckx (from 2022-09-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 2002-10-04 | ||||
Maximilian Philipp (from 2023-01-30) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2022-07-30 18:01 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2022-10-18 20:45 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-01-31 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |