Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Timo Schultz (from 2024-01-04) (until 2024-06-30) | 1977-08-26 | ||||
Steffen Baumgart (until 2023-12-21) | 1972-01-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Kevin McKenna (until 2024-06-30) | 1980-01-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marvin Schwabe | 1995-04-25 | |||
12 | Jonas Nickisch (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-05-21 | |||
20 | Philipp Pentke | 1985-05-01 | |||
44 | Matthias Kobbing (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-08-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Elias Bakatukanda (from 2024-05-01) | 2004-04-13 | ||||
2 | Benno Schmitz (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
3 | Dominique Heintz (from 2023-08-31) | 1993-08-15 | |||
3 | Kristian Pedersen (until 2023-08-31) | 1994-08-04 | |||
4 | Timo Hubers | 1996-07-20 | |||
15 | Luca Kilian | 1999-09-01 | |||
17 | Leart Pacarada | 1994-10-08 | |||
18 | Rasmus Carstensen | 2000-11-10 | |||
24 | Julian Chabot (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | |||
30 | Noah Katterbach (until 2024-01-31) | 2001-04-13 | |||
35 | Max Finkgräfe | 2004-03-27 | |||
40 | Faride Alidou (from 2023-08-21) (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-07-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Eric Martel | 2002-04-29 | |||
7 | Dejan Ljubicic | 1997-10-08 | |||
8 | Denis Huseinbasic | 2001-07-03 | |||
11 | Florian Kainz | 1992-10-24 | |||
22 | Jacob Christensen | 2001-06-25 | |||
30 | Marvin Obuz (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-01-25 | |||
37 | Linton Maina | 1999-06-23 | |||
42 | Damion Downs | 2004-07-06 | |||
45 | Justin Diehl (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-11-27 | |||
47 | Mathias Olesen (until 2024-01-23) | 2001-03-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Luca Waldschmidt | 1996-05-19 | |||
13 | Mark Uth | 1991-08-24 | |||
19 | Dimitris Limnios (until 2023-12-31) | 1998-05-27 | |||
21 | Steffen Tigges | 1998-07-31 | |||
23 | Sargis Adamjan | 1993-05-23 | |||
27 | Davie Selke (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-01-20 | |||
29 | Jan Thielmann | 2002-05-26 | |||
33 | Florian Dietz | 1998-08-03 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Tim Lemperle (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-02-05 | ||||
Jonas Urbig (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-08-08 | ||||
Nikola Soldo (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-25 | ||||
Mathias Olesen (from 2024-01-23) (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-03-21 | ||||
Marvin Obuz (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-01-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2023-08-14 20:45 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-10-31 20:45 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |