Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (from 2024-02-14) (until 2024-06-30) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Dimitrios Grammozis (from 2023-12-03) (until 2024-02-13) | 1978-07-08 | ||||
Dirk Schuster (until 2023-11-30) | 1967-12-29 | ||||
Teammanager | |||||
Enis Hajri (until 2024-06-30) | 1983-03-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Niklas Heeger (from 2023-09-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-07 | ||||
Robin Himmelmann (from 2024-01-28) (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-02-05 | ||||
1 | Andreas Luthe (until 2024-01-29) | 1987-03-10 | |||
18 | Julian Krahl | 2000-01-22 | |||
30 | Avdo Spahic | 1997-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jan Elvedi | 1996-09-30 | ||||
Almamy Toure (from 2023-11-15) | 1996-04-28 | ||||
Nikola Soldo (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-25 | ||||
Frank Ronstadt (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-07-21 | ||||
Nikolaos Vakouftsis (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-03-31 | ||||
2 | Boris Tomiak | 1998-09-11 | |||
5 | Kevin Kraus (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-08-12 | |||
15 | Tymoteusz Puchacz (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-01-23 | |||
16 | Jean Zimmer | 1993-12-06 | |||
23 | Philipp Hercher (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-03-21 | |||
37 | Erik Durm (until 2024-01-24) | 1992-05-12 | |||
38 | Neal Gibs (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-01-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hikmet Ciftci (until 2023-08-22) | 1998-03-10 | ||||
4 | Afeez Aremu (from 2023-08-23) | 1999-10-03 | |||
10 | Philipp Klement | 1992-09-09 | |||
11 | Kenny Redondo | 1994-08-29 | |||
16 | Julian Niehues (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-04-17 | |||
20 | Tobias Raschl | 2000-02-21 | |||
21 | Hendrick Zuck (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-07-21 | |||
26 | Filip Kaloč (from 2024-01-12) | 2000-02-27 | |||
39 | Aaron Basenach (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-02-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ragnar Ache | 1998-07-28 | ||||
Dickson Abiama (from 2024-01-01) | 1998-11-03 | ||||
Ba-Muaka Simakala (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-01-28 | ||||
Marc Blum (until 2023-06-30) | 2003-01-14 | ||||
7 | Marlon Ritter | 1994-10-15 | |||
13 | Terrence Boyd (until 2024-01-10) | 1991-02-16 | |||
19 | Daniel Hanslik | 1996-10-06 | |||
25 | Aaron Opoku | 1999-03-28 | |||
25 | Filip Stojilkovic (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-04 | |||
27 | Tyger Lobinger (until 2024-01-05) | 1999-02-22 | |||
29 | Richmond Tachie | 1999-04-21 | |||
31 | Ben Zolinski (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-05-03 | |||
34 | Marc Blum (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-01-14 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Tyger Lobinger (from 2024-01-05) (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-02-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-08-13 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-10-31 20:45 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-12-05 18:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2024-01-31 20:45 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2024-04-02 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2024-05-25 20:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |