Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assistenztrainerin | |||||
Marie-Louise Eta (from 2023-11-16) (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-07-07 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Marco Grote (from 2024-05-06) (until 2024-06-30) | 1972-10-11 | ||||
Nenad Bjelica (from 2023-11-26) (until 2024-05-06) | 1971-08-20 | ||||
Danijel Jumić (from 2024-01-27) (until 2024-02-23) | 1986-06-27 | ||||
Urs Fischer (until 2023-11-15) | 1966-02-20 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Marco Grote (from 2023-11-16) (until 2023-12-01) | 1972-10-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frederik Ronnow | 1992-08-04 | |||
12 | Jakob Busk (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-09-12 | |||
37 | Alexander Schwolow | 1992-06-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Leonardo Bonucci (from 2023-09-01) (until 2024-01-11) | 1987-05-01 | ||||
Dominique Heintz (until 2023-08-31) | 1993-08-15 | ||||
Mathis Bruns (until 2023-08-24) | 2004-03-31 | ||||
2 | Kevin Vogt (from 2024-01-11) | 1991-09-23 | |||
3 | Paul Jaeckel (until 2024-08-29) | 1998-07-22 | |||
4 | Diogo Leite | 1999-01-23 | |||
5 | Danilho Doekhi | 1998-06-30 | |||
6 | Robin Gosens (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-07-05 | |||
18 | Josip Juranović | 1995-08-16 | |||
26 | Jérôme Roussillon | 1993-01-06 | |||
28 | Christopher Trimmel | 1987-02-24 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-05-22 | |||
33 | Alex Kral (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-05-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Baris Kalayci (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-03-30) | 2005-08-30 | ||||
Tim Schleinitz (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-03-30) | 2005-06-10 | ||||
Oluwaseun God Power Osaro Ogbemudia (until 2024-01-30) | 2006-07-18 | ||||
Aljoscha Kemlein (until 2024-01-07) | 2004-08-02 | ||||
7 | Brenden Aaronson (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-10-22 | |||
8 | Rani Khedira | 1994-01-27 | |||
13 | András Schäfer | 1999-04-13 | |||
19 | Janik Haberer | 1994-04-02 | |||
20 | Aïssa Laïdouni (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-12-13 | |||
21 | Tim Skarke (until 2023-09-01) | 1996-09-07 | |||
29 | Lucas Tousart | 1997-04-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
David Datro Fofana (until 2024-01-11) | 2002-12-22 | ||||
9 | Mikkel Kaufmann Sørensen (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-01-03 | |||
10 | Kevin Volland (from 2023-08-17) | 1992-07-30 | |||
11 | Chris Bedia (from 2024-01-18) (until 2024-08-22) | 1996-03-05 | |||
14 | Yorbe Vertessen (from 2024-02-01) | 2001-01-08 | |||
16 | Benedict Hollerbach | 2001-05-17 | |||
17 | Kevin Behrens (until 2024-01-31) | 1991-02-03 | |||
27 | Sheraldo Becker (until 2024-01-17) | 1995-02-09 | |||
32 | Milos Pantovic (until 2023-08-28) | 1996-07-07 | |||
45 | Theoson-Jordan Siebatcheu (until 2023-08-31) | 1996-04-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Lennart Grill | 1999-01-25 | ||||
Tymoteusz Puchacz (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-01-23 | ||||
Jamie Leweling (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-02-26 | ||||
Morten Thorsby (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-05-05 | ||||
Theoson-Jordan Siebatcheu (from 2023-08-31) (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-04-26 | ||||
Tim Skarke (from 2023-09-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-09-07 | ||||
Aljoscha Kemlein (from 2024-01-07) (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-08-02 | ||||
Keita Endo (from 2024-01-07) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-11-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-08-13 18:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-10-31 18:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |