Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Sebald | 1996-07-27 | |||
1 | Karl Pischon (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-03-02 | |||
12 | Elias Bethke | 2003-03-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Tünay Bektas (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-07-07 | ||||
4 | Tim Campulka | 1999-04-28 | |||
17 | Jonas Hildebrandt (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-12-08 | |||
19 | Filip Kusic (from 2024-02-27) | 1996-06-03 | |||
20 | Axel Borgmann | 1994-07-08 | |||
27 | Dennis Slamar | 1994-09-08 | |||
28 | Niko Bretschneider (from 2024-01-16) | 1999-08-10 | |||
31 | Paul Milde | 1995-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Dominik Pelivan | 1996-06-08 | |||
6 | Jonas Hofmann | 1997-02-07 | |||
8 | Joshua Putze | 1994-12-02 | |||
21 | Yannik Moker (from 2024-01-22) | 1999-07-27 | |||
23 | Maximilian Krauss | 1996-11-24 | |||
32 | Finn Heidrich (from 2024-01-01) | ||||
33 | Jan Shcherbakovski (from 2024-01-30) | 2001-03-24 | |||
36 | Janis Juckel | 2004-07-29 | |||
37 | Alexander Prokopenko (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-01-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Timmy Thiele | 1991-07-31 | |||
9 | Tim Heike (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-02-25 | |||
10 | Maximilian Oesterhelweg (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-07-21 | |||
11 | Phil Halbauer | 1998-08-17 | |||
14 | Tobias Hasse | 1996-01-03 | |||
18 | Cedric Euschen (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-03-07 | |||
22 | Rudolf Dovn Ndualu (until 2024-09-02) | 1999-07-22 | |||
42 | Maximilian Pronichev (from 2024-01-01) | 1997-11-17 | |||
verliehen | |||||
16 | Arnel Kujovic (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-03-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-08-13 18:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |