Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fatih Cift (until 2024-06-30) | 1981-10-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Maximilian Grote (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-03-30 | |||
31 | Romaric Grenz (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-04-02 | |||
33 | Cedric Taxis (until 2024-06-30) | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Kenan Dogan (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-04-22 | |||
4 | Dejvi Alsela (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-11-01 | |||
17 | Leon Gietzen (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-09-16 | |||
18 | Alexis Weidenbach (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-09-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Randy Manu Gyamenah (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-24 | ||||
Jeff Ampadu (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-12-30 | ||||
6 | Terry Asare (until 2024-06-23) | 1997-09-16 | |||
7 | Leon Wilki (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-10-03 | |||
8 | Nihat Farajli (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-01-21 | |||
9 | Niklas Doll (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-12-12 | |||
19 | Tyler-Jeremy Wozny (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-05-12 | |||
29 | Jonas Ercan (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-07-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Randy Manu Gyamenah (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-24 | |||
11 | Nao Oriyama (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-11-19 | |||
13 | Max Klas (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-03-21 | |||
22 | Jordi Arndt (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-04-22 | |||
27 | Mike Borger (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-07-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-08-13 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |