Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Reisinger (from 2024-04-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1981-09-14 | ||||
Sreto Ristic (until 2024-04-01) | 1976-02-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Philipp Schulze (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-01-29 | ||||
1 | Sven Muller | 1996-02-16 | |||
30 | Moritz Schulze (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-03-22 | |||
32 | Luca Bendel (until 2024-01-11) | 2003-08-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sebastian Zieleniecki (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-02-16 | ||||
Brian Behrendt (from 2024-01-08) (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | ||||
5 | Jannes Vollert (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-01-21 | |||
8 | Niklas Kreuzer (until 2024-08-29) | 1993-02-20 | |||
19 | Jordi Wegmann | 2002-05-21 | |||
21 | Tim-Justin Dietrich (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-11-08 | |||
22 | Nico Hug (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-10-26 | |||
31 | Niklas Landgraf | 1996-03-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marvin Awuah (from 2024-01-01) | 2005-03-05 | ||||
Pierre Weber (from 2024-05-27) | 2004-02-04 | ||||
Max Kulke (from 2024-02-01) | 2000-11-10 | ||||
Julian Eitschberger (from 2023-09-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-03-05 | ||||
Cedric Sponholz (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-04-08 | ||||
Theodor Zorn (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-10-05 | ||||
6 | Enrique Lofolomo (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-14 | |||
7 | Leon Damer (until 2023-09-01) | 2000-01-31 | |||
10 | Timur Gayret (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-08-08 | |||
11 | Tom Baumgart (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-11-12 | |||
16 | Lucas Halangk (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-09-22 | |||
17 | Aljaz Casar (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-09-17 | |||
20 | Tunay Deniz (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-02-02 | |||
23 | Besar Halimi (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-12-12 | |||
25 | Marvin Ajani (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-10-04 | |||
26 | Paul Hamella (from 2024-01-01) | 2005-08-26 | |||
27 | Matthew Meier (until 2024-01-11) | 2004-04-16 | |||
29 | Andor Bolyki (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-09-06 | |||
37 | Luka Vujanic (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-01-18 | |||
Mittelfeld/Sturm | |||||
Marco Wolf (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-02-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Tarsis Bonga (from 2024-01-06) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-01-10 | ||||
Patrick Hasenhuttl (from 2023-08-17) (until 2024-03-18) | 1997-05-20 | ||||
9 | Meris Skenderovic (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-03-28 | |||
14 | Henry Jon Crosthwaite (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-10-14 | |||
28 | Dominic Baumann (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-04-24 | |||
33 | Jonas Nietfeld (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-15 | |||
40 | Erich Berko (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-09-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2023-08-12 18:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |