Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Steffen Baumgart (from 2024-02-19) | 1972-01-05 | ||||
Tim Walter (until 2024-02-12) | 1975-11-08 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Merlin Polzin (from 2024-02-12) (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Marko Johansson (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-01-30) | 1998-08-25 | ||||
1 | Daniel Heuer Fernandes | 1992-11-13 | |||
12 | Tom Mickel | 1989-04-19 | |||
12 | Tom Mickel (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-04-19 | |||
19 | Matheo Raab | 1998-12-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Noah Katterbach (from 2024-01-31) | 2001-04-13 | ||||
2 | William Mikelbrencis (from 2023-08-30) (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-02-25 | |||
3 | Moritz Heyer | 1995-04-04 | |||
4 | Sebastian Schonlau | 1994-08-05 | |||
5 | Dennis Hadzikadunic | 1998-07-09 | |||
13 | Guilherme Ramos (until 2024-09-03) | 1997-08-11 | |||
14 | Nicolas Oliveira Kisilowski (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-02-06 | |||
22 | Ignace Van der Brempt (from 2023-07-18) (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-04-01 | |||
28 | Miro Muheim | 1998-03-24 | |||
34 | Jonas David (until 2023-08-29) | 2000-03-08 | |||
35 | Stephan Kofi Ambrosius (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-12-18 | |||
37 | Valon Zumberi (until 2024-01-15) | 2002-11-24 | |||
43 | Bent Andresen (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-01-07 | |||
44 | Mario Vuskovic | 2001-11-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Omar Megeed | 2005-08-19 | ||||
Otto Stange (until 2024-06-30) | |||||
6 | Lukasz Poręba (from 2023-08-30) | 2000-03-13 | |||
8 | Laszlo Benes (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-09-09 | |||
10 | Immanuel Pherai | 2001-04-25 | |||
14 | Ludovit Reis | 2000-06-01 | |||
17 | Masaya Okugawa (from 2024-01-14) (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-04-14 | |||
23 | Jonas Meffert | 1994-09-04 | |||
27 | Jean-Luc Dompe | 1995-08-12 | |||
36 | Anssi Suhonen | 2001-01-14 | |||
42 | Ogechika Heil (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-11-27 | |||
46 | Elijah Krahn (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-08-24 | |||
48 | Bilal Yalcinkaya | 2006-03-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Tom Sanne (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-04-13 | ||||
Robin Meissner (until 2023-06-30) | 1999-10-08 | ||||
9 | Robert Glatzel | 1994-01-08 | |||
11 | Ransford Konigsdorffer | 2001-09-13 | |||
18 | Bakery Jatta | 1998-06-06 | |||
20 | András Németh (until 2024-08-22) | 2002-11-09 | |||
21 | Levin Oztunali | 1996-03-15 | |||
42 | Ogechika Heil (until 2023-08-31) | 2000-11-27 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Leo Oppermann (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-08-28 | ||||
Jonas David (from 2023-08-29) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-03-08 | ||||
Valon Zumberi (from 2024-01-15) (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-11-24 | ||||
Marko Johansson (from 2024-01-30) (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-08-25 | ||||
Marko Johansson (until 2023-12-31) | 1998-10-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-08-13 13:00 |
3 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2023-10-31 20:45 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2023-12-06 20:45 |
5 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |