Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Joe Enochs | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Felix Gebhardt | 2002-03-01 | |||
32 | Alexander Weidinger | 1997-06-18 | |||
32 | Leon-Mate Cuk | 2003-04-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Bryan Hein | 2001-09-25 | |||
4 | Florian Ballas | 1993-01-08 | |||
11 | Konrad Faber (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-11-04 | |||
13 | Alexander Bittroff | 1988-09-19 | |||
14 | Robin Ziegele | 1997-03-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bryan Anthony Hein (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-09-25 | ||||
Eric Tallig (from 2024-01-06) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-10 | ||||
5 | Rasim Bulic | 2000-12-10 | |||
6 | Benedikt Saller | 1992-09-22 | |||
8 | Andreas Geipl | 1992-04-21 | |||
10 | Christian Viet | 1999-03-27 | |||
16 | Louis Breunig | 2003-11-14 | |||
18 | Niclas Anspach | 2000-07-22 | |||
19 | Christian Schmidt | 2002-02-07 | |||
20 | Noah Ganaus | 2001-01-19 | |||
21 | Tobias Eisenhuth | 2001-09-21 | |||
22 | Noel Eichinger (until 2024-01-25) | 2001-08-02 | |||
25 | Jonas Bauer | 2003-08-03 | |||
31 | Max Meyer | 2006-08-17 | |||
37 | Leopold Wurm (from 2023-09-27) | 2006-03-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Valdrin Mustafa (from 2024-01-16) (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-03-11 | ||||
Agyemang Diawusie (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | ||||
7 | Oscar Schonfelder | 2001-02-05 | |||
9 | Eric Hottmann | 2000-02-08 | |||
23 | Jannik Graf (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-11-29 | |||
29 | Elias Huth | 1997-02-10 | |||
34 | Dominik Kother | 2000-03-16 | |||
36 | Kelvin Onuigwe (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-12-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2023-08-14 18:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |