Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Nico Burchert (until 2024-06-30) | 1987-06-24 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Lukas Kwasniok | 1981-06-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Pelle Boevink | 1998-01-06 | |||
1 | Moritz Schulze (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-03-22 | |||
1 | Florian Pruhs (until 2024-06-30) | 2006-02-06 | |||
21 | Jannik Huth (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-04-15 | |||
35 | Arne Schulz (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-03-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jesse Edem Tugbenyo (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-08-07 | ||||
Vincent Gembalies (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-01-18 | ||||
4 | Calvin Brackelmann (from 2023-08-31) | 1999-08-22 | |||
13 | Robin Yalcin (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-25 | |||
15 | Tobias Muller (until 2023-12-31) | 1994-07-08 | |||
16 | Visar Musliu | 1994-11-13 | |||
17 | Laurin Curda | 2001-10-30 | |||
17 | Kimberly Ezekwem (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-06-19 | |||
24 | Jannis Heuer (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-07-29 | |||
31 | Maximilian Rohr (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-06-27 | |||
32 | Aaron Zehnter (from 2024-01-05) | 2004-10-31 | |||
37 | Jascha Brandt (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-03-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Anton Bäuerle (from 2024-05-25) | 2005-04-30 | ||||
Michael Martin (from 2023-09-01) (until 2024-01-05) | 2000-07-10 | ||||
6 | Marco Schuster (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-10-10 | |||
8 | David Kinsombi | 1995-12-12 | |||
13 | Robert Leipertz (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-02-01 | |||
20 | Filip Bilbija (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-04-24 | |||
22 | Mattes Hansen | 2004-05-15 | |||
23 | Raphael Obermair | 1996-04-01 | |||
26 | Sebastian Klaas | 1998-06-30 | |||
27 | Kai Klefisch (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-12-03 | |||
29 | Ilyas Ansah | 2004-11-08 | |||
30 | Florent Muslija (until 2024-01-25) | 1998-07-06 | |||
33 | Marcel Hoffmeier | 1999-07-15 | |||
34 | Dawyn-Paul Donner (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-08-06 | |||
40 | Niclas Tibor Nadj (until 2024-01-24) | 2000-12-24 | |||
43 | Martin Ens | 2001-12-20 | |||
44 | Medin Kojic (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2005-12-09 | |||
45 | Marco Pledl (from 2024-04-01) | 2000-12-13 | |||
46 | Luis Engelns (from 2024-04-01) | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Moritz Flotho (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-05-26 | ||||
Max Kruse (until 2023-11-24) | 1988-03-19 | ||||
10 | Koen Kostons (from 2024-01-09) | 1999-09-18 | |||
11 | Sirlord Conteh (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-07-09 | |||
18 | Dennis Srbeny (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-05-05 | |||
36 | Felix Platte | 1996-02-11 | |||
39 | Adriano Grimaldi | 1991-04-05 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Jasper van der Werff (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-12-09 | ||||
Niclas Tibor Nadj (from 2024-01-24) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-12-24 | ||||
Justus Henke (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-06-05 | ||||
Marcel Mehlem (until 2023-08-30) | 1995-03-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2023-08-13 18:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2023-11-01 18:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2023-12-06 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |