Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Koschinat (from 2023-11-27) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Tobias Schweinsteiger (until 2023-11-14) | 1982-03-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Luca Böggemann | 2004-03-11 | ||||
1 | Lennart Grill (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-01-25 | |||
22 | Philipp Kuhn (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-03-29 | |||
25 | Daniel Adamczyk (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-07-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Florian Bähr (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-02-18 | ||||
Oumar Diakhite (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-12-09 | ||||
3 | Florian Kleinhansl (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-08-11 | |||
4 | Maxwell Gyamfi | 2000-01-18 | |||
5 | Bashkim Ajdini | 1992-12-10 | |||
16 | Henry Rorig (from 2023-07-14) (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-03-03 | |||
24 | Manuel Haas (until 2023-10-16) | 1996-05-07 | |||
25 | Niklas Wiemann | 1999-02-23 | |||
33 | Timo Beermann | 1990-12-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mickael Cuisance (from 2023-09-02) (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-08-16 | ||||
Athanasios Androutsos (from 2024-01-08) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-05-06 | ||||
6 | Maximilian Thalhammer (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-07-10 | |||
8 | Robert Tesche | 1987-05-27 | |||
13 | Lukas Kunze (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-06-14 | |||
15 | Paterson Chato (until 2024-01-19) | 1996-12-01 | |||
18 | Lars Kehl | 2002-04-08 | |||
26 | Dave Gnaase | 1996-12-26 | |||
29 | Oliver Wahling (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-09-06 | |||
30 | Emeka Oduah | 2002-04-14 | |||
32 | Jannes Wulff | 1999-09-14 | |||
38 | Kevin Wiethaup | 2005-08-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Charalambos Makridis (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-07-05 | ||||
John Verhoek (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-03-25 | ||||
Tyger Lobinger (from 2024-01-05) (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-02-22 | ||||
Thomas Goiginger (from 2024-01-31) (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-03-15 | ||||
7 | Noel Niemann (until 2024-08-08) | 1999-11-14 | |||
9 | Erik Engelhardt | 1998-04-18 | |||
10 | Kwasi Wriedt (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-07-10 | |||
17 | Christian Conteh (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-08-27 | |||
19 | Leandro Putaro (until 2023-08-29) | 1997-01-07 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Yigit Karademir (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-04-10 | ||||
Leandro Putaro (from 2023-08-29) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-01-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2023-08-14 20:45 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |