Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ole Werner | 1988-05-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jiri Pavlenka (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-14 | |||
30 | Michael Zetterer (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | |||
38 | Eduardo Dos Santos Haesler (until 2024-06-30) | 1999-02-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Nicolai Rapp (until 2024-01-23) | 1996-12-13 | ||||
3 | Anthony Jung | 1991-11-03 | |||
4 | Niklas Stark | 1995-04-14 | |||
5 | Amos Pieper | 1998-01-17 | |||
8 | Mitchell Weiser | 1994-04-21 | |||
13 | Milos Veljkovic | 1995-09-26 | |||
19 | Dikeni-Rafid Salifou (until 2023-09-01) | 2003-06-08 | |||
22 | Julián Malatini (from 2024-01-16) | 2001-05-31 | |||
27 | Felix Agu | 1999-09-27 | |||
32 | Marco Friedl | 1998-03-16 | |||
40 | Cimo Rocker (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-01-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Olivier Deman | 2000-04-06 | |||
6 | Jens Stage | 1996-11-08 | |||
10 | Leonardo Bittencourt | 1993-12-19 | |||
14 | Senne Lynen (from 2023-08-08) | 1999-02-19 | |||
18 | Naby Keita | 1995-02-10 | |||
20 | Romano Schmid | 2000-01-27 | |||
21 | Isak Hansen-Aaroen (from 2024-01-01) | 2004-08-22 | |||
28 | Skelly Alvero (from 2024-01-31) | 2002-05-04 | |||
28 | Ilia Gruev (until 2023-08-31) | 2000-05-06 | |||
35 | Leon Opitz | 2005-04-11 | |||
36 | Christian Gross (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-02-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Marvin Ducksch | 1994-03-07 | |||
9 | Dawid Kownacki (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-03-14 | |||
11 | Niclas Fullkrug (until 2023-08-31) | 1993-02-09 | |||
17 | Justin Njinmah (until 2024-06-30) | 2000-11-15 | |||
19 | Santos Borre (from 2023-09-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 1995-09-15 | |||
24 | Kein Sato (from 2024-01-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-07-11 | |||
24 | Oliver Burke (until 2023-09-02) | 1997-04-07 | |||
26 | Joel Imasuen (from 2024-01-01) | 2004-10-27 | |||
29 | Nick Woltemade (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-02-14 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Dikeni-Rafid Salifou (from 2023-09-01) (until 2024-06-30) | 2003-06-08 | ||||
Eren Sami Dinkci (until 2024-06-30) | 2001-12-13 | ||||
Mio Backhaus (until 2024-06-30) | 2004-04-16 | ||||
Oliver Burke (from 2023-09-02) (until 2024-06-30) | 1997-04-07 | ||||
Abdenego Nankishi (from 2024-01-31) (until 2024-06-30) | 2002-07-06 | ||||
Abdenego Nankishi (until 2024-01-31) | 2002-07-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2023-08-12 15:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |