Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ernst Georg (until 1945-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
Franz Weiland (from 1943-07-01) (until 1944-06-30) | |||||
Toni Monschin (from 1943-07-01) (until 1944-06-30) | |||||
Karl Dahlheimer (until 1943-06-30) | 1906 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Nikolaus Biewer (from 1943-07-01) (until 1955-06-30) | 1922-01-24 | ||||
Heinrich Schmidt (until 1952-06-30) | 1912-01-10 | ||||
Arthur Braun (from 1943-07-01) (until 1946-06-30) | |||||
Hugo Decker (until 1943-06-30) | |||||
Richard Seiler (until 1943-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Joachim Pluckhahn (from 1943-01-01) (until 1947-06-30) | 1916 | ||||
Alois Speicher (until 1944-06-30) | |||||
Siebentritt (until 1944-06-30) | |||||
Wilhelm Sold (until 1943-12-31) | 1911-04-19 | ||||
Johann Herberger (from 1942-11-01) (until 1943-06-30) | 1919-11-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jakob Balzert (until 1955-06-30) | 1918-01-06 | ||||
Herbert Dorn (until 1953-06-30) | 1920-08-12 | ||||
Heinz Kurtsiefer (until 1952-06-30) | 1919 | ||||
Alois Schmitz (from 1943-07-01) (until 1946-06-30) | |||||
Herbert Binkert (until 1945-06-30) | 1923-09-03 | ||||
Ludwig Biewer (from 1943-07-01) (until 1944-06-30) | |||||
Herbert Baier (until 1943-06-30) | 1920-01-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1943-08-22 |
8 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1943-09-12 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1943-10-03 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |