Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Paul Osswald (until 1964-04-17) | 1905-02-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ivica Horvat (from 1961-07-01) (until 1964-06-30) | 1926-07-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Egon Loy (until 1967-06-30) | 1931-05-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hermann Hofer (until 1966-06-30) | 1934-07-19 | ||||
Friedel Lutz (until 1966-06-30) | 1939-01-21 | ||||
Willi Herbert (until 1965-06-30) | 1938-06-10 | ||||
Alfred Horn (from 1961-07-01) (until 1965-06-30) | 1936-09-07 | ||||
Hans Weilbacher (until 1965-06-30) | 1933-10-23 | ||||
Hans-Walter Eigenbrodt (until 1964-06-30) | 1935-08-04 | ||||
Eberhard Schymik (until 1964-06-30) | 1934-07-08 | ||||
Adolf Bechtold (until 1963-06-30) | 1926-02-20 | ||||
Peter Buttner (until 1963-06-30) | 1939-05-13 | ||||
Ernst Kudrass (until 1962-06-30) | 1924-09-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Lindner (until 1972-06-30) | 1939-06-11 | ||||
Ludwig Landerer (from 1961-07-01) (until 1966-06-30) | 1937-05-31 | ||||
Dieter Stinka (until 1966-06-30) | 1937-08-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Solz (until 1968-06-30) | 1940-02-12 | ||||
Lothar Schamer (until 1966-06-30) | 1940-04-28 | ||||
Erwin Stein (until 1966-06-30) | 1935-06-10 | ||||
Richard Kress (until 1964-06-30) | 1925-03-06 | ||||
Dieter Kraft (until 1963-06-30) | 1940-03-03 | ||||
Erich Meier (until 1962-06-30) | 1935-03-30 | ||||
Ernst Kreuz (until 1962-06-30) | 1940-09-29 | ||||
Alfred Pfaff (until 1961-06-30) | 1926-07-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1961-07-28 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |