Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tschik Cajkovski (until 1963-06-30) | 1923-11-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Anton Schumacher (until 1968-06-30) | 1938-12-01 | ||||
Fritz Ewert (until 1966-06-30) | 1937-02-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wolfgang Weber (from 1962-07-01) (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-06-26 | ||||
Mathias Hemmersbach (until 1973-06-30) | 1941-07-26 | ||||
Fritz Pott (until 1970-06-30) | 1939-04-23 | ||||
Anton Regh (until 1969-06-30) | 1940-09-12 | ||||
Georg Stollenwerk (until 1966-06-30) | 1930-12-19 | ||||
Leo Wilden (until 1966-06-30) | 1936-07-03 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schnellinger (until 1963-06-30) | 1939-03-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans Sturm (until 1967-06-30) | 1935-09-03 | ||||
Hans Schafer (until 1966-06-30) | 1927-10-19 | ||||
Helmut Benthaus (from 1962-07-01) (until 1965-06-30) | 1935-06-05 | ||||
Ernst-Gunter Habig (until 1963-06-30) | 1935-09-14 | ||||
Paul Eich (until 1963-06-30) | 1938-02-23 | ||||
Jurgen Heitmann (until 1963-06-30) | 1935-06-02 | ||||
Manfred Rohrig (until 1963-06-30) | 1938-07-27 | ||||
Christian Breuer (until 1962-06-30) | 1939-04-24 | ||||
Joachim Alda (until 1962-06-30) | 1940-04-29 | ||||
Fritz Breuer (until 1961-12-31) | 1929-08-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Thielen (until 1973-06-30) | 1940-04-02 | ||||
Heinz Hornig (from 1962-07-01) (until 1970-06-30) | 1937-09-28 | ||||
Christian Muller (until 1966-06-30) | 1938-08-29 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Ripkens (until 1964-06-30) | 1937-12-09 | ||||
Georg Tripp (from 1962-07-01) (until 1963-06-30) | 1941-03-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1962-07-28 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1962-08-08 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |