Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Max Merkel (from 1962-07-01) (until 1966-12-10) | 1918-12-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Petar Radenkovic (from 1962-07-01) (until 1970-06-30) | 1934-10-01 | ||||
Fritz Herrnleben (from 1962-07-01) (until 1964-06-30) | 1941-04-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Wagner (until 1971-06-30) | 1938-08-31 | ||||
Rudolf Zeiser (from 1962-07-01) (until 1970-06-30) | 1936-03-31 | ||||
Hans Reich (until 1969-06-30) | 1942-07-10 | ||||
Rudolf Steiner (until 1969-06-30) | 1937-04-07 | ||||
Hans Humpa (from 1962-07-01) (until 1965-06-30) | 1939-04-17 | ||||
Gunter Rahm (until 1964-06-30) | 1934-10-02 | ||||
Alfons Stemmer (until 1964-06-30) | 1933-10-19 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans Kuppers (until 1968-06-30) | 1938-12-24 | ||||
Helmut Benthaus (until 1962-06-30) | 1935-06-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wilfried Kohlars (from 1962-07-01) (until 1971-06-30) | 1939-10-28 | ||||
Alfred Heiss (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-12-05 | ||||
Hans Rebele (until 1969-06-30) | 1943-01-26 | ||||
Rudi Brunnenmeier (until 1968-06-30) | 1941-02-11 | ||||
Werner Anzill (until 1964-06-30) | 1940-04-19 | ||||
Hans Auernhammer (until 1964-06-30) | 1933-10-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1962-07-28 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1962-08-08 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |