Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmut Schneider (until 1965-01-27) | 1913-07-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Hassdenteufel (until 1968-06-30) | 1941-10-13 | ||||
Volker Danner (until 1966-06-30) | 1942-08-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Erich Rohe (until 1972-06-30) | 1937-08-24 | ||||
Albert Port (until 1967-06-30) | 1942-05-24 | ||||
Horst Remark (until 1966-06-30) | 1936-06-01 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Grund (until 1965-06-30) | 1941-10-11 | ||||
Werner Hesse (until 1965-06-30) | 1934-02-12 | ||||
Heinz Steinmann (until 1964-06-30) | 1938-02-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Dieter Diehl (until 1972-06-30) | 1941-08-23 | ||||
Manfred Klein (until 1966-06-30) | 1935-12-08 | ||||
Werner Rinas (until 1965-06-30) | 1939-01-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Holzenbein (until 1965-06-30) | 1939-02-04 | ||||
Heinz Vollmar (until 1965-06-30) | 1936-04-26 | ||||
Dieter Krafczyk (until 1964-06-30) | 1941-09-23 | ||||
Erich Maas (until 1964-06-30) | 1940-12-24 | ||||
Karl Meng (until 1964-06-30) | 1938-08-06 | ||||
Friedel Reuther (until 1964-06-30) | 1942-02-04 | ||||
Rainer Schonwalder (until 1964-06-30) | 1940-02-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1964-04-08 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1964-04-22 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1964-05-20 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |