Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hermann Eppenhoff (from 1964-05-11) (until 1965-06-30) | 1919-05-19 | ||||
Heinz Kwiatkowski (from 1964-05-04) (until 1964-05-10) | 1926-07-16 | ||||
Hermann Eppenhoff (until 1964-05-03) | 1919-05-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernhard Wessel (until 1969-06-30) | 1936-08-20 | ||||
Hans Tilkowski (until 1967-06-30) | 1935-07-12 | ||||
Heinz Kwiatkowski (until 1964-06-30) | 1926-07-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wolfgang Paul (until 1971-06-30) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Theo Redder (until 1969-06-30) | 1941-11-19 | ||||
Manfred Pfeiffer (until 1968-06-30) | 1942-02-09 | ||||
Gerd Cyliax (until 1968-06-30) | 1934-08-23 | ||||
Helmut Bracht (until 1964-06-30) | 1929-09-11 | ||||
Wilhelm Burgsmuller (until 1964-06-30) | 1932-01-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hoppy Kurrat (until 1974-06-30) | 1942-05-15 | ||||
Willi Sturm (until 1971-06-30) | 1940-02-08 | ||||
Reinhold Wosab (until 1971-06-30) | 1938-02-25 | ||||
Aki Schmidt (until 1968-06-30) | 1935-09-05 | ||||
Lothar Geisler (until 1967-06-30) | 1936-12-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Lothar Emmerich (until 1969-06-30) | 1941-11-29 | ||||
Franz Brungs (until 1965-06-30) | 1936-12-04 | ||||
Timo Konietzka (until 1965-06-30) | 1938-08-02 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Kurrat (until 1964-06-30) | 1944-07-07 | ||||
Burghard Rylewicz (until 1964-06-30) | 1936-07-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1964-04-08 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |