Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmuth Johannsen (until 1970-06-30) | 1920-02-27 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1979-03-21) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Wolter (until 1972-06-30) | 1942-06-08 | ||||
Hans Jacker (until 1967-06-30) | 1932-11-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Joachim Base (until 1973-06-30) | 1939-09-02 | ||||
Peter Kaack (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-12-09 | ||||
Walter Schmidt (until 1970-06-30) | 1937-08-02 | ||||
Wolfgang Brase (until 1968-06-30) | 1939-02-07 | ||||
Klaus Meyer (until 1968-06-30) | 1937-08-05 | ||||
Gunter Busse (until 1966-06-30) | 1941-04-24 | ||||
Ernst Saalfrank (until 1965-06-30) | 1939-10-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Wolfram (until 1965-06-30) | 1939-07-28 | ||||
Aykut Unyazici (until 1965-06-30) | 1936-12-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Krafczyk (until 1966-06-30) | 1941-09-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Klaus Gerwien (until 1973-06-30) | 1940-09-11 | ||||
Erich Maas (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-12-24 | ||||
Lothar Ulsass (until 1969-06-30) | 1940-09-09 | ||||
Hans-Georg Dulz (until 1968-06-30) | 1936-10-31 | ||||
Lothar Weschke (until 1966-06-30) | 1943-10-11 | ||||
Helmut Hosung (until 1965-06-30) | 1940-04-01 | ||||
Jurgen Moll (until 1965-06-30) | 1939-11-16 | ||||
Gerhard Schrader (until 1965-06-30) | 1940-01-01 | ||||
Manfred Wuttich (until 1965-06-30) | 1941-01-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1965-01-16 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1965-02-06 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1965-02-27 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |