Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ivica Horvat (until 1965-06-30) | 1926-07-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Egon Loy (until 1967-06-30) | 1931-05-14 | ||||
Karl Eisenhofer (until 1965-06-30) | 1934-09-04 | ||||
Spira Djuric (until 1965-06-30) | 1940-05-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hermann Hofer (until 1966-06-30) | 1934-07-19 | ||||
Friedel Lutz (until 1966-06-30) | 1939-01-21 | ||||
Richard Weber (until 1966-06-30) | 1938-06-27 | ||||
Willi Herbert (until 1965-06-30) | 1938-06-10 | ||||
Alfred Horn (until 1965-06-30) | 1936-09-07 | ||||
Fritz Kubert (until 1965-06-30) | 1939-12-08 | ||||
Hans Weilbacher (until 1965-06-30) | 1933-10-23 | ||||
Josef Weilbacher (until 1965-06-30) | 1944-12-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Lindner (until 1972-06-30) | 1939-06-11 | ||||
Helmut Kraus (until 1969-06-30) | 1938-11-16 | ||||
Walter Bechtold (until 1969-06-30) | 1947-07-25 | ||||
Jurgen Friedrich (until 1968-06-30) | 1943-11-11 | ||||
Peter Blusch (until 1968-06-30) | 1942-06-11 | ||||
Ludwig Landerer (until 1966-06-30) | 1937-05-31 | ||||
Dieter Stinka (until 1966-06-30) | 1937-08-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Willi Huberts (until 1970-06-30) | 1938-02-22 | ||||
Wolfgang Solz (until 1968-06-30) | 1940-02-12 | ||||
Lothar Schamer (until 1966-06-30) | 1940-04-28 | ||||
Erwin Stein (until 1966-06-30) | 1935-06-10 | ||||
Horst Trimhold (until 1966-06-30) | 1941-02-04 | ||||
Georg Lechner (until 1966-06-30) | 1941-08-18 | ||||
Hans-Georg Tutschek (until 1965-06-30) | 1941-09-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1965-01-16 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1965-02-06 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |