Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmuth Johannsen (until 1970-06-30) | 1920-02-27 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1979-03-21) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Wolter (until 1972-06-30) | 1942-06-08 | ||||
Burkhardt Oller (until 1971-06-30) | 1942-11-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wolfgang Grzyb (until 1978-06-30) | 1940-07-29 | ||||
Joachim Base (until 1973-06-30) | 1939-09-02 | ||||
Peter Kaack (until 1973-06-30) | 1943-12-09 | ||||
Walter Schmidt (until 1970-06-30) | 1937-08-02 | ||||
Jurgen Moll (until 1968-12-16) | 1939-11-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Brase (until 1968-06-30) | 1939-02-07 | ||||
Klaus Meyer (until 1968-06-30) | 1937-08-05 | ||||
Wolfgang Simon (until 1968-06-30) | 1946-08-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Elfert (until 1971-06-30) | 1942-09-06 | ||||
Michael Polywka (until 1971-06-30) | 1944-04-06 | ||||
Horst Berg (until 1969-06-30) | 1941-09-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jaro Deppe (until 1976-06-30) | 1948-04-10 | ||||
Klaus Gerwien (until 1973-06-30) | 1940-09-11 | ||||
Gerd Saborowski (until 1971-06-30) | 1943-09-03 | ||||
Erich Maas (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-12-24 | ||||
Lothar Ulsass (until 1969-06-30) | 1940-09-09 | ||||
Hans-Georg Dulz (until 1968-06-30) | 1936-10-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1968-01-27 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1968-02-24 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1968-04-11 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1968-04-23 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |