Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietrich Weise (from 1969-05-07) (until 1969-06-30) | 1934-11-21 | ||||
Egon Piechaczek (until 1969-05-06) | 1931-11-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Josef Stabel (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-09-21 | ||||
Wolfgang Schnarr (until 1970-06-30) | 1941-06-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ernst Diehl (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-03-28 | ||||
Dietmar Schwager (until 1976-06-30) | 1940-08-15 | ||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1972-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Gerd Schneider (until 1970-06-30) | 1940-12-18 | ||||
Jurgen Rumor (until 1970-06-30) | 1945-02-19 | ||||
Werner Glass (until 1970-06-30) | 1950-02-18 | ||||
Roland Kiefaber (until 1969-06-30) | 1942-09-19 | ||||
Uwe Klimaschefski (until 1969-06-30) | 1938-12-11 | ||||
Volker Klein (until 1969-06-30) | 1949-04-11 | ||||
Herwart Koppenhofer (until 1969-06-30) | 1946-05-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Friedrich (until 1974-06-30) | 1943-11-11 | ||||
Otto Geisert (until 1970-06-30) | 1939-11-18 | ||||
Hermann Soyez (until 1969-06-30) | 1949-04-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerhard Kentschke (until 1970-06-30) | 1942-09-18 | ||||
Heinz-Dieter Hasebrink (until 1969-06-30) | 1941-08-28 | ||||
Bernd Windhausen (until 1969-06-30) | 1942-09-22 | ||||
Heinz-Dieter Hansing (until 1969-06-30) | 1947-03-09 | ||||
Josef Pirrung (until 1969-06-30) | 1949-07-24 | ||||
Ivan Milic (until 1969-06-30) | 1945-03-17 | ||||
Peter Schmidt (until 1969-06-30) | 1943-12-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1969-01-04 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1969-02-15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1969-04-05 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1969-05-03 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1969-05-13 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |